Torres v. MMS Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: elewood torres
Defendant: MMS Group, LLC, Housing Development Fund Corporation, TUC Management Company, Inc., New York Society For The Deaf, New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, New York City Housing Preservation and Development, NYSD Forsyth Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and MMS Group, LLC doing business as MMS Group
Case Number: 1:2022cv06142
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie Figueredo
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #42 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam E. Collyer dated September 13, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application Granted. TUC Management Company, Inc. answer due 10/13/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 9/15/2022) (rro)
September 14, 2022 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MMS Group, LLC served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Agent for Service of Process, Office of Secretary of State. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
September 13, 2022 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam E. Collyer dated September 13, 2022. Document filed by TUC Management Company, Inc...(Collyer, Adam)
September 13, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Rickershauser on behalf of TUC Management Company, Inc...(Rickershauser, Stephen)
September 13, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Edward Collyer on behalf of TUC Management Company, Inc...(Collyer, Adam)
August 29, 2022 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Housing Development Fund Corporation served on 8/11/2022, answer due 9/1/2022. Service was accepted by Lynette Prince, Treasurer. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
August 29, 2022 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MMS Group, LLC served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. Service was accepted by Maria J., person designated to receive service. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
August 23, 2022 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. NYSD Forsyth Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Doughtery, Agent for Service of Process, Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
August 23, 2022 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. TUC Management Company, Inc. served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Doughtery, Agent for Service of Process, Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
August 23, 2022 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New York Society For The Deaf served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Doughtery, Agent for Service of Process, Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
August 17, 2022 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to MMS Group, LLC..(jgo)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #31 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Melissa Ysaguirre dated August 15,2022., #1 Complaint,. DHCR has until September 30, 2022 to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the complaint. New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal answer due 9/30/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 8/17/2022) (ate)
August 17, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/30/2022. (ate)
August 16, 2022 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to MMS Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
August 15, 2022 Filing 31 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Melissa Ysaguirre dated August 15,2022. Document filed by New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal..(Ysaguirre, Melissa)
August 15, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Ellen Ysaguirre on behalf of New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal..(Ysaguirre, Melissa)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 8/11/2022) (ama)
August 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York City Housing Preservation and Development answer due 9/30/2022. (ama)
August 9, 2022 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New York City Housing Preservation and Development served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. Service was accepted by Anne Sullivan, City Clerk. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
August 9, 2022 Filing 27 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrea Brustein dated August 9, 2022. Document filed by New York City Housing Preservation and Development..(Brustein, Andrea)
August 4, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Brustein on behalf of New York City Housing Preservation and Development..(Brustein, Andrea)
August 3, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. Service was accepted by Naiema Page, Clerk. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/28/2022) (ks)
July 25, 2022 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TUC Management Company, Inc...(lal)
July 25, 2022 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYSD Forsyth Housing Development Fund Company, Inc...(lal)
July 25, 2022 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Housing Preservation and Development..(lal)
July 25, 2022 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal..(lal)
July 25, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Society For The Deaf..(lal)
July 25, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MMS Group, LLC..(lal)
July 25, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Housing Development Fund Corporation..(lal) Modified on 7/25/2022 (lal).
July 22, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T.U.C. Management Company, Inc, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 22, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYSD Forsyth Housing Development Fund Company, Inc, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 22, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Preservation and Development, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Society For The Deaf, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 22, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MMS GROUP, LLC d/b/a MMS GROUP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 22, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Housing Development Fund Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elewood Torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mordy Yankovich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $20,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
July 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mordy Yankovich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Elewood Torres, MMS Group LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
July 20, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 20, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mordy Yankovich to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 20, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
July 19, 2022 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Yankovich, Mordy)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYSD Forsyth Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sj).
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Preservation and Development, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sj).
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sj).
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Society for the Deaf, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sj).
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Housing Development Fund Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sj).
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MMS Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sj).
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T.U.C. Management Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sj).
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MMS Group, LLC, Housing Development Fund Corporation, TUC Management Company, Inc., New York Society For The Deaf, New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal, New York City Housing Preservation and Development, NYSD Forsyth Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26434106)Document filed by elewood torres..(Yankovich, Mordy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. MMS Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: elewood torres
Represented By: Mordy Yankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMS Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Development Fund Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUC Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Edward Collyer
Represented By: Stephen Rickershauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Society For The Deaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal
Represented By: Melissa Ellen Ysaguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Housing Preservation and Development
Represented By: Andrea Brustein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYSD Forsyth Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMS Group, LLC doing business as MMS Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?