Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. American Commercial Transport, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Rohlig USA LLC, Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc., Translink Shipping Inc., Annex Global Logistics, Inc., Cargo World, LLC, Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc, Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited, Sealink International, Inc., United Global Logistics, Inc and Does One through Ten
3Rd Party Plaintiff: American Commercial Transport, Inc., UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd. and Pronto Great China Corp
Cross Defendant: Hyundai Merchant Marine CO Ltd
3Rd Party Defendant: Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., Shine Shipping Ltd, Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, ROES 1-10, inclusive, HMM Co Ltd., Roes 1 through 10, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, Roes, Hapag-Lloyd A.G., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation, Yang Ming (America) Corporation, Roes 1-10, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC and JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv06386
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2023 Filing 184 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marlo J. Hittman on behalf of Shipco Transport, Shipco Transport Inc, Shipco Transport Inc., Shipco Transport Inc., Shipco Transport, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Hittman, Marlo)
February 10, 2023 Filing 183 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by HMM Co Ltd...(Giffin, John)
February 9, 2023 Filing 182 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd...(Donatelli, Randolph)
February 7, 2023 Filing 181 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Anchor Ocean for CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Chidori Ship Holding, LLC, Chidori Ship Holding, LLC, Chidori Ship Holding, LLC, Chidori Ship Holding, LLC, Chidori Ship Holding, LLC, Chidori Ship Holding, LLC, Chidori Ship Holdings LLC, Chidori Ship Holdings LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDINGS S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDINGS S.A., JESSICA SHIP HOLDINGS S.A., JESSICA SHIPHOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A., Jessica Ship Holding, S.A. ; Corporate Parent Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha for NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., NYK Ship Management Pte., Ltd., NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD, NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD., NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD., NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD., NYK Shipmanagement PTE Ltd., NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd, NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD., JESSICA SHIP HOLDINGS S.A., Chidori Ship Holding, LLC, M/V One Apus in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., M/V One Apus, in rem, JESSICA SHIPHOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding, S.A., Chidori Ship Holdings LLC, NYK Ship Management Pte., Ltd., Jessica Ship Holding S.A.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Nakazawa, Alan)
February 6, 2023 Filing 180 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A...(Semenoro, Timothy)
February 6, 2023 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Eugene O'Connor on behalf of Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V ONE Apus, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(O'Connor, Robert)
February 6, 2023 Filing 178 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Semenoro on behalf of Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V ONE Apus, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Semenoro, Timothy)
February 6, 2023 Filing 177 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha for NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd; Corporate Parent Anchor Ocean for Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. Document filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V ONE Apus, NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Nakazawa, Alan) Modified on 2/7/2023 (lb).
December 30, 2022 Filing 176 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Network Express Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Yusen Kaisha, Other Affiliate Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Other Affiliate Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. for Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.. Document filed by Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-06386-PAE.(Donatelli, Randolph)
December 30, 2022 Filing 175 ANSWER to #76 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd...(Donatelli, Randolph)
December 30, 2022 Filing 174 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Network Express Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Yusen Kaisha, Other Affiliate Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Other Affiliate Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. for Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.. Document filed by Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd...(Donatelli, Randolph)
December 29, 2022 Filing 173 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hmm Co. LTD..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Giffin, John)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER NO. 4: It was agreed at the initial court conference that it was in the best interest of the parties to continue settlement discussions. In order to accomplish this, the status quo must be maintained in terms of discovery, motions, and claims currently on extensions of time for suit or arbitration. Accordingly, the Court defers entering a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order until after March 31, 2023. Upon request of counsel, the Vessel Interests will grant the Cargo Interests and the NVOCC Interests, in regard to claims that are currently on time extensions, further extensions of time to file suit or to commence arbitration up to and including August 31, 2023 on the same terms, conditions, and reservations as set forth in the prior extensions. Upon request of counsel, the NVOCC Interests will grant the Cargo Interests, in regard to claims that are currently on time extensions, further extensions of time to file suit or to commence arbitration up to and including August 31, 2023 on the same terms, conditions, and reservations as set forth in the prior extensions. No formal discovery shall be undertaken before March 31, 2023, but the parties may voluntarily exchange documents in the context of settlement discussions. No motions to dismiss or for summary judgment shall be filed before March 31, 2023. The Cargo, NVOCC, and Vessel Interests will jointly report by letter to the Court on their progress on January 16, 2023; February 15, 2023; and March 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/22/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (ks)
December 16, 2022 Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Wayne Heard on behalf of Global Ocean Agency Lines, Meadows WYE Container Groupage. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Heard, Keith)
December 13, 2022 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deniz Perkowski on behalf of Rohlig USA LLC, Apex Logistics International Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., APEX Martime Co., Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax) Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (ORD) Inc., MOL Consolidation Service Ltd, MOL Worldwide Logistics, Limited, APEX Martime Co., Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (LAX) Inc, Apex Maritime Co. (ORD) Inc., Apex Maritime Co. (Lax) Inc., Starlink Freight System (SFO) Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Perkowski, Deniz)
December 12, 2022 Filing 169 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Tanner Honea on behalf of HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Honea, John)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting (230 in case 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Service due by 12/12/2022.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/7/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (vfr)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (196) Letter Motion for Oral Argument; granting in part and denying in part (207) Letter Motion for Oral Argument in case 1:22-md-03028-PAE. Accordingly, any counsel who intends to be heard, or who reserves the opportunity to be heard at the conference must appear in person. Recognizing the costs and inconvenience that travel may present for some counsel, the Court will, however, permit counsel who do not seek to speak at the conference to audit the conference telephonically. It is essential that every distinct interest in this case be represent by a counsel attending in person. The Court therefore expects that, at a minimum, each relevant group of interests (e.g., Cargo Counsel; NVOCC; Vessel) be represented in person at the conference, and that any party that chooses not to send a counsel in person have delegated authority to speak at the conference to a counsel attending in person. To assure clarity as to which counsel will be attending, and as to the delegated authority that each counsel will have, the Court directs counsel for each group of interests to file on the docket of this case a letter, due December 12, 2022, identifying all counsel who will attend, and the party or parties on behalf of which each will have authority to speak. To the extent that counsel wish the Court make a record of those counsel who will be auditing the conference telephonically, the above letters should set out the names of such counsel. To the extent that counsel, parties, or the public wish to audit the conference, they should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the (#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, as further set forth herein. Counsel should arrive by 2 p.m. on December 15, 2022, and be prepared for the conference to begin at 2:30 p.m. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully ordered to terminate the motions pending at dockets 196 and 207. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/30/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (vfr)
November 9, 2022 Filing 166 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:22-cv-4609 - that 1:22-cv-4609 be Consolidated as a Member Case on MDL Docket 1:22-md-3028 addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Lauren B. Wilgus dated 11/8/22. Document filed by China Int'l Freight Co., Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Wilgus, Lauren)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #164 Motion for Maya Barba to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/27/2022) (va)
October 26, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #164 MOTION for Maya Basilia Barba to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26870891. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
October 25, 2022 Filing 164 MOTION for Maya Basilia Barba to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26870891. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HMM Co Ltd., Hyundai Merchant Marine CO Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Maya Barba in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing to Affidavit of Maya Barba in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Barba, Maya)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): The Court having considered the Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), finds good cause exists, and does hereby dismiss all claims made by Plaintiff TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA as against Defendant TRANSLINK SHIPPING, INC. in the above-referenced action. This dismissal does not reach any claims asserted by other plaintiffs against other defendants in the subject action. IT IS SO ORDERED. Translink Shipping Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/25/2022) (vfr)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #161 Motion for John D. Giffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/20/2022) (vfr) Modified on 10/21/2022 (vfr).
October 20, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #161 MOTION for John D. Giffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26841499. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
October 19, 2022 Filing 161 MOTION for John D. Giffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26841499. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HMM Co Ltd., Hyundai Merchant Marine CO Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of John D. Giffin in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing to Affidavit of John D. Giffin in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Giffin, John)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER in case 1:22-md-03028-PAE; granting (159) Motion for Connor M. Trafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:22-cv-06386-PAE. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/18/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-06386-PAE (yv)
October 18, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #159 MOTION for Connor M. Trafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26826906. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
October 17, 2022 Filing 159 MOTION for Connor M. Trafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26826906. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HMM Co Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Connor M. Trafton in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit (Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Trafton, Connor)
August 9, 2022 Filing 158 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick)
August 9, 2022 Filing 157 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lee Reeb on behalf of Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc...(Reeb, Robert)
August 9, 2022 Filing 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lee Reeb on behalf of Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc...(Reeb, Robert)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #153 MOTION for Michael J. Perry to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael J. Perry terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2022) (jca)
July 29, 2022 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #153 MOTION for Michael J. Perry to Withdraw as Attorney . . Document filed by Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Perry).(Liang, Shanshan)
July 29, 2022 Filing 153 MOTION for Michael J. Perry to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc..(Liang, Shanshan)
July 27, 2022 Filing 152 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:21-cv-08784. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
July 27, 2022 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (vba)
July 27, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
July 27, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
July 27, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
July 27, 2022 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
July 27, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
June 16, 2022 Filing 151 TRANSFER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3028, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer. Case transferred electronically 6/17/2022. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 150 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The 6/14/2022 Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM and the 6/28/2022 hearing on NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complainants' Shine International and Shine Shipping's Cross-Claim against HMM Co., Ltd. #118 and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.'s First Amended Third Party Complaint #119 at 10:00 AM have been terminated, pursuant to JOINT REPORT of RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO ORDER IN MDL 3028 AND REQUEST TO VACATE FUTURE DATES #149 . All dated are hereby vacated and closure of this case is pending the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's 6/1/2022 Order in MDL No. 3028, transferring this action to the Southern District of New York is officially entered. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 149 JOINT REPORT of RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO ORDER IN MDL 3028 AND REQUEST TO VACATE FUTURE DATES filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 148 OBJECTIONS to Response in Support of Motion, #143 filed by Third Party Defendants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd. (Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 19, 2022 Filing 147 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. On the Court's own motion, the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complainants' Shine International and Shine Shipping's Cross-Claim against HMM Co., Ltd. #118 and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.'s First Amended Third Party Complaint #119 is continued from 5/24/2022 to 6/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. TO ANSWER PRONTO GREAT CHINA CORP.S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1), #144 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that consistent with Local Rule 7-1 (Stipulations), OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. has an extension of time from May 23, 2022, up to and including June 22, 2022, to file an Answer to Third-Party Plaintiff,PRONTO GREAT CHINA CORP.s Third Party Complaint, which was filed on December 29, 2021.IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. TO ANSWER BON VOYAGE LOGISTICS, INC.S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1), #144 , by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that consistent with Local Rule 7-1 (Stipulations), OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. has an extension of time from May 23, 2022, up to and including June 22, 2022, to file an Answer to Third-Party Plaintiff BON VOYAGE LOGISTICS, INC.s Third Party Complaint, which was filed on January 18, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 18, 2022 Filing 144 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ocean Network Express PTE LTD answer now due 6/22/2022, re Third Party Complaint, #76 filed by DEFENDANT Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Juliette Bowen McCullough added to party Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc (pty:3pp))(McCullough, Juliette) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 17, 2022 Filing 143 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complainants' Shine International and Shine Shipping's Cross-Claim against HMM Co., Ltd. #118 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd, Cross Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Corrected Declaration of Seung Hyung Kim, #2 Declaration of Jin Hong Lee)(Giffin, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 17, 2022 Filing 142 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.'s First Amended Third Party Complaint #119 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd, Cross Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Corrected Declaration of HMM Co., Ltd's Custodian of Records ISO of Its Motion to Dismiss)(Giffin, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 17, 2022 Filing 141 Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pronto Great China Corp answer now due 5/23/2022, re Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by DEFENDANT Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCullough, Juliette) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 11, 2022 Filing 140 JOINDER filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc. joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #137 , Objection #138 . (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 139 JOINDER filed by Third Party Defendants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #136 . (Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 138 OBJECTIONS to declaration of Seung Hyung Kim [DKT. NO. 118-1] filed by Third Party Defendants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd. (Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 137 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complainants' Shine International and Shine Shipping's Cross-Claim against HMM Co., Ltd. #118 filed by Third Party Defendants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lei Ming Kwan, #2 Declaration of Sohyun Yoon)(Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 136 Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.'s First Amended Third Party Complaint #119 filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M Uthoff, #2 Declaration of Charles Wong, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit in support of opposition)(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT, #134 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that consistent with Local Rule 7-1 (Stipulations), OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. has a second extension of time from May 2, 2022, up to and including June 14, 2022, to file a responsive pleading to ANNEX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.S First Amended Third Party Complaint, which was filed on December 10, 2021 (DE 38) and served on January 6, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
May 4, 2022 Filing 134 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 14, 2022 re Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by DEFENDANT Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCullough, Juliette) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON HMM CO. LTD.S MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF 118 AND 119), #132 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The briefing schedule on HMMs motions to dismiss is revised as follows: a. Any opposition to HMMs motions to dismiss, previously due on May 3, 2022, must now be filed by May 10, 2022; b. Any reply to HMMs motions to dismiss, previously due on May 10, 2022, must now be filed by May 17, 2022. 2. The hearing on HMMs motions to dismiss will remain on May 24, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. before the Hon. Ronald S.W. Lew in courtroom 5B. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 132 STIPULATION for Order re: Briefing Schedule on HMM Co. LTD.'s Motions to Dismiss (ECF 118 and 119) filed by Third-Party Defendants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. TO ANSWER PRONTO GREATCHINA CORP.S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1), #130 , by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that consistent with Local Rule 7-1 (Stipulations), OCEANNETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. has an extension of time from April 21, 2022, up toand including May 23, 2022, to file an Answer to Third-Party Plaintiff PRONTOGREAT CHINA CORP.s Third Party Complaint, #59 which was filed on December 29,2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Filing 130 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd. answer now due 5/23/2022, filed by DEFENDANT Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piper, Glen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Filing 129 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 128 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Filing 127 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited served on 2/1/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARINGS ON HMM'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DE 118 and 119) #124 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The hearings on HMM's Motions to Dismiss (DE 118 and 119) are continued from May 3, 2022 to May 24, 2022, 10:00 a.m before the Hon. Ronald S.W. Lew; courtroom 5B. As such, any opposition to the motions will be due May 3, 2022 and any replies will be due May 10, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Filing 124 STIPULATION to Continue hearings on HMM's motions to dismiss from May 3, 2022 to May 24, 2022 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 120 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.'s First Amended Third Party Complaint #119 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complainants' Shine International and Shine Shipping's Cross-Claim against HMM Co., Ltd. #118 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT #123 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that consistent with Local Rule 7-1, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. has a second extension of time from April 5, 2022, up to and including May 2, 2022, to file a responsive pleading to ANNEX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.'S First Amended Third Party Complaint. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Filing 123 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by DEFENDANT Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Glen R Piper added to party Ocean Network Express PTE LTD(pty:3pd))(Piper, Glen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER CONTINUING THE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO JUNE 14, 2022, #121 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Having considered the stipulation submitted by the parties hereto, and good cause appearing therefor: The initial scheduling conference now set for April 12, 2022 is continued to June 14, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Filing 121 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference from April 12, 2022 to June 14, 2022 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing The Initial Scheduling Conference to June 14, 2022)(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Filing 120 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The hearing on the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complainants' Shine International and Shine Shipping's Cross-Claim against HMM Co., Ltd. #118 is continued from 4/26/2022 to 5/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.'s First Amended Third Party Complaint filed by Third-Party Defendant HMM Co., Ltd., Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 5/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Seung Hyung Kim, #2 Proposed Order) (Giffin, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complainants' Shine International and Shine Shipping's Cross-Claim against HMM Co., Ltd. filed by Cross-Defendant HMM Co., Ltd., Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Seung Hyung Kim, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney John David Giffin added to party Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd(pty:crd)) (Giffin, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND CROSS DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO CROSSCLAIM #116 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court rules as follows: 1. The Stipulation is hereby GRANTED; and 2. Cross-Defendant shall respond to the Crossclaim on or before March 18, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 116 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd answer now due 3/18/2022, re Order Extending Answer Due Deadline, #113 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #111 , Crossclaim #103 filed by Cross-Defendant HMM Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trafton, Connor) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. TO ANSWER PRONTO GREAT CHINA CORP.'S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1) #114 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT consistent with Local Rule 7-1 (Stipulations), OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. has an extension of time from March 22, 2022, up to and including April 21, 2022, to file an Answer to Third-Party Plaintiff PRONTO GREAT CHINA CORP.'s Third Party Complaint, which was filed on December 29, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 8, 2022 Filing 114 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pronto Great China Corp answer now due 4/21/2022, filed by DEFENDANT Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Juliette Bowen McCullough added to party Ocean Network Express PTE LTD(pty:3pd))(McCullough, Juliette) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTSDEADLINE TO RESPOND TO CROSSCLAIM, #111 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The Court rules as follows: 1. The Stipulation is hereby GRANTED; and 2. Third-Party Defendant shall respond to the Crossclaim on or before March 11, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Cross-Defendant & Third Party Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd, identifying HMM Co., Ltd. (formerly known as HYUNDAI MERCHANT MARINE CO. LTD.). (Trafton, Connor) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 111 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd answer now due 3/11/2022, re Crossclaim #103 filed by cross-Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trafton, Connor) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. TO ANSWER ANNEX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.S FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1) granting Stipulation #106 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Having considered the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT consistent with Local Rule 7-1 (Stipulations), OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. has an extension of time from March 7, 2022, up to and including April 5, 2022, to file an Answer to Third-Party Plaintiff ANNEX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.'s First Amended Third Party Complaint, which was filed on December 10, 2021 (DE 38). (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 109 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc, upon Third Party Defendant Hapag-Lloyd AG served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Guido (authorized to accept) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Liang, Shanshan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 108 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Third Party Plaintiff Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc. upon Ocean Network Express PTE LTD waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Eric Chang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liang, Shanshan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #104 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 106 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Annex Global Logistics, Inc. answer now due 4/5/2022, filed by DEFENDANT Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Juliette Bowen McCullough added to party Ocean Network Express PTE LTD(pty:crd))(McCullough, Juliette) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alisa Manasantivongs counsel for Defendant Rohlig USA, LLC. Adding Alisa Manasantivongs as counsel of record for Rohlig USA, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rohlig USA, LLC. (Attorney Alisa Manasantivongs added to party Rohlig USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Manasantivongs, Alisa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendant HMM Co., Ltd.. (Giffin, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 103 CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendants Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd, Ocean Network Express PTE LTD, filed by Third Party Defendants and Cross-Complainants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd.(Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 102 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third Party Defendants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd, identifying Annex Global Logistics, Inc., Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd., Shine Shipping Ltd., Ocean Network Express PTE. Ltd., Hyundai Merchant Marine Co. Ltd.. (Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 101 ANSWER to Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by Defendant Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd.(Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 100 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc., upon Third Party Defendant Shine Shipping Ltd served on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon American Alternative Insurance Corp; registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 99 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Cargo World, LLC (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 98 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Cargo World, LLC filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua A. Southwick in Support of Request to Enter Default, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Joshua A. Southwick in Support of Request to Enter Default, #3 Proposed Order Granting Request to Enter Default) (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 97 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Sealink International, Inc (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 10, 2022 Filing 96 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Sealink International, Inc filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua A. Southwick in Support of Request to Enter Default, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Joshua A. Southwick in Support of Request to Enter Default, #3 Proposed Order Granting Request to Enter Default) (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Translink Shipping, Inc..(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc..(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Annex Global Logistics, Inc..(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 92 FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Roes 1-10, Yang Ming (America) Corporation, Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation amending Third Party Complaint, #77 , filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Estrella, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 90 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #76 as to Third Party Defendant Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 89 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #77 as to Third Party Defendant Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 88 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #77 as to Defendant Yang Ming (America) Corporation. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND SHINE INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION (HONG KONG)LTD. & SHINE SHIPPING LTD.S TIME TO RESPOND TO ANNEX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.S FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT, #83 , by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd. and Shine Shipping Ltd. shall file a responsive pleading to the First Amended Third-Party Complaint by Feb 11th 2022. 2. Annex Global Logistics Inc. shall file proof of service of process of the Summons and Third-Party Complaint on Shine Shipping Ltd. prior to Feb 11th 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 87 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #77 filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit as to Yang Ming (America) Corporation)(Estrella, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Third Party Complaint, #77 . The following error(s) was/were found: No summons was prepared or on the docket for issuance of the Third Party Defendant(s) In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 85 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #76 as to Third Party Defendant Hapag-Lloyd AG. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 25, 2022 Filing 84 (as to the First Amended Third Pary Complaint) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.. upon Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/6/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Eric Chang. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 83 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd answer now due 2/11/2022; Shine Shipping Ltd answer now due 2/11/2022, re Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by Third-Party Defendants Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd; Shine Shipping Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Neil B Klein added to party Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd(pty:3pd), Attorney Neil B Klein added to party Shine Shipping Ltd(pty:3pd))(Klein, Neil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Filing 82 Third-Party Defendant HMM Co., Ltd's ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, #46 filed by Third Party Defendant HMM Co., Ltd..(Attorney Connor M Trafton added to party HMM Co., Ltd.(pty:3pd))(Trafton, Connor) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth causes of action are dismissed, without prejudice, as to TRANSLINK SHIPPING, INC.; ANNEX GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC. and TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC only; The Court vacates as moot the motion hearing set for February 8, 2022; and Defendants TRANSLINK SHIPPING, INC.; ANNEX GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC. and TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC. shall file an answer to the remaining claims in plaintiff's Complaint herein no later than February 4, 2022. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ON THE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO APRIL 12, 2022, #78 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The initial scheduling conference now set for February 8, 2022 is continued to April 12, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Joint Report shall be filed on or before April 4, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 79 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss The Second, Third and Fourth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint #62 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second, Third and Fourth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint #70 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 78 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from February 8, 2022 to April 12, 2022 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #49 filed by Defendants Annex Global Logistics, Inc., Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., Translink Shipping, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Filing 77 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation, Yang Ming (America) Corporation, Roes 1-10, filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Estrella, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Filing 76 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., ROES 1 through 10, Hapag-Lloyd AG, filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Hapag Lloyd AG, #2 Proposed Summons - ONE)(Liang, Shanshan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT #74 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court rules as follows: 1. The Stipulation is hereby GRANTED; and 2. Third-Party Defendant shall respond to the First Amended Third-Party Complaint on or before January 21, 2022. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Filing 74 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #73 , Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by Third Party Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trafton, Connor) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Filing 73 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd answer now due 1/21/2022, re Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by Third Party Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Connor M Trafton added to party Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd(pty:3pd))(Trafton, Connor) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc (Liang, Shanshan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Filing 71 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc., upon Third Party Defendant Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon American Alternative Insurance Corp; registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second, Third and Fourth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Wang, #2 Exhibit (s) in support of Motion, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order) (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perry, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-08974, 2:21-cv-09083 (Estrella, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd.(Estrella, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 66 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #59 as to Third Party Defendant Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 65 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #59 filed by Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff Pronto Great China Corp. (Bayles, David) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Third Party Complaint #59 . The following error(s) was/were found: Please issue t\he summons using the correct docketing event and as a separate document In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Annex Global Logistics, Inc., Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., Translink Shipping, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-08974-SB-SK; 2:21-cv-9159-MCS-PD; 2:21-cv-08985-SB-PD; 2:21-cv-09007-MCS-PD; 2:21-cv-09083-MWF-MRW; 2:21-cv-09400-RSWL-MAR; 2:21-cv-09605-FLA-JPR (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss The Second, Third and Fourth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Annex Global Logistics, Inc., Translink Shipping, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Wong, #2 Declaration Barbara Johnson, #3 Exhibit (s) in support of Motion, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc., upon Third Party Defendant Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd. served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro (authorized to accept) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc., upon Third Party Defendant Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kay Lee, Administrator (authorized to accept) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 59 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd. Pronto Great China Corp, filed by Defendant Pronto Great China Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint)(McNeil, Malcolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Pronto Great China Corp (McNeil, Malcolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pronto Great China Corp, (McNeil, Malcolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Pronto Great China Corp.(McNeil, Malcolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc, identifying BON VOYAGE LOGISTICS, INC.. (Perry, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #51 Non-Resident Attorney Shanshan Liang APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc, designating Michael J. Perry as local counsel. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., identifying Topocean Consolidated Service (Los Angeles) Inc.; New York Marine & General Insurance; Prosight Specialty Insurance; Avlon Risk Management. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Translink Shipping, Inc., identifying Translink Shipping, Inc.; Affluent Group Holding Co., Inc.; International General Insurance Co. Ltd.. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Filing 51 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanshang Liang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32523199) filed by Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Perry, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Filing 50 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc answer now due 1/4/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc.(Attorney Michael J Perry added to party Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc (pty:dft))(Perry, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The above matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on February 8, 2022, at 10:00 A.M. The conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference and report to the Court not later than 14 days after they confer as required by F.R.Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. See order for more information. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 16, 2021 Filing 48 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 as to Third Party Defendants Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David G Bayles counsel for Defendant Pronto Great China Corp. Adding David G. Bayles as counsel of record for Pronto Great China Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Pronto Great China Corp.. (Attorney David G Bayles added to party Pronto Great China Corp(pty:dft))(Bayles, David) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 46 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd; HMM Co., Ltd and Roes 1 through 10 Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., HMM Co., Ltd., ROES 1 through 10, filed by American Commercial Transport, Inc. American Commercial Transport, Inc.(Rose, Bradley) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by American Commercial Transport, Inc. American Commercial Transport, Inc.(Rose, Bradley) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 44 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons -ONE, #2 Proposed Summons - Shine Intl Trans (Hong Kong), #3 Proposed Summons - Shine Shipping)(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Amended Third-Party Complaint, #38 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. A First Amended Third Party Complaint was filed so the Summons must reflect "First Amended Third Party Complaint"... The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rohlig USA, LLC, (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rohlig USA, LLC.(Attorney Danielle Ashley Smith added to party Rohlig USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Commercial Transport, Inc answer now due 1/20/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Commercial Transport, Inc. American Commercial Transport, Inc.(Attorney Bradley Rose added to party American Commercial Transport, Inc(pty:dft))(Rose, Bradley) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 39 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc. answer now due 1/5/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc..(Attorney Stephen M Uthoff added to party Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc.(pty:dft))(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 38 First AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendants Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd, Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, Shine Shipping Ltd, Roes 1-10 Inclusive amending Third Party Complaint, #27 , filed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 9, 2021 Filing 37 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #27 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons ONE, #2 proposed summons Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong), #3 proposed summons Shine Shipping)(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 8, 2021 Filing 36 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Translink Shipping, Inc. answer now due 1/3/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Translink Shipping, Inc..(Attorney Stephen M Uthoff added to party Translink Shipping, Inc.(pty:dft))(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 6, 2021 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Sealink International, Inc served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael J. Yan - Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 3, 2021 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pronto Great China Corp answer now due 12/31/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Pronto Great China Corp.(Attorney Malcolm S McNeil added to party Pronto Great China Corp(pty:dft))(McNeil, Malcolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd, identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. and UPINSCO. (Estrella, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd answer now due 12/31/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd.(Attorney Mark P. Estrella added to party UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd (pty:dft))(Estrella, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant American Commercial Transport, Inc served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Global Logistics, Inc, identifying None. (Landau, Ross) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United Global Logistics, Inc.(Attorney Ross Ian Landau added to party United Global Logistics, Inc (pty:dft))(Landau, Ross) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 30, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc., identifying Annex Global Logistics, Inc.. (Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 30, 2021 Filing 27 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendants Hyundai Merchant Marine Co Ltd, Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., Shine Shipping Ltd, Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd, filed by Third Party Plaintiff Annex Global Logistics, Inc..(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Annex Global Logistics, Inc. answer now due 1/3/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Annex Global Logistics, Inc..(Attorney Stephen M Uthoff added to party Annex Global Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Uthoff, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Distribution-Publications, Inc., Agent for Service by serving James Devine - President in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael)[Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Withdrawal of Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #21 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Cargo World, LLC served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon NEISON NEl-GUN LIU AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc. served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jacob Wu - Clerk & Authorized to Accept in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 21 [WITHDRAWN PER DKT, #24 - 11/22/2021 - of America, upon Defendant Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Billy K. Chan, Agenf or Service by serving Sherry Mia - Manager & Authorized to Accept in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) Modified on 11/23/2021 (shb). [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Quartz Logistics Inc. - Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant United Global Logistics, Inc served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lalidh Gallagee in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Pronto Great China Corp served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon William Soong - Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Translink Shipping, Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent by serving Lai Saevang - Customer Service Liaison & Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent by serving Lai Saevang - Customer Service Liaison & Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Rohlig USA, LLC served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent by serving Lai Saevang - Customer Service Liaison & Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-07655 CJC(ASx) (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Annex Global Logistics, Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Ruiz - Employee & Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Commercial Transport, Inc, Annex Global Logistics, Inc., Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc, Cargo World, LLC, Pronto Great China Corp, Rohlig USA, LLC, Sealink International, Inc, Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited, Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., Translink Shipping, Inc., UPS Asia Group PTE. Ltd, United Global Logistics, Inc. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua A Southwick counsel for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Adding JOSHUA A SOUTHWICK as counsel of record for TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua A Southwick on behalf of Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Corp., The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE/ NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, identifying The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32290890 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attorney Michael J Cummins added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla))(Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/27/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. American Commercial Transport, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Michael J. Cummins
Represented By: Joshua A. Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: American Commercial Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Frank C Brucculeri
Represented By: Bradley Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd.
Represented By: Mark P. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Pronto Great China Corp
Represented By: Genine Go Cumba
Represented By: David G. Bayles
Represented By: Malcolm S McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohlig USA LLC
Represented By: Erich P. Wise
Represented By: Lisa M Conner
Represented By: Alisa Manasantivongs
Represented By: Danielle Cruz
Represented By: Deniz Perkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Represented By: Stephen M. Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Translink Shipping Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Represented By: Stephen M. Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annex Global Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Represented By: Stephen M. Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargo World, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Voyage Logistics, Inc
Represented By: Shanshan Liang
Represented By: Michael J. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianshi Logistics Co., Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealink International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Global Logistics, Inc
Represented By: Frank Xavier Dipolito
Represented By: Ross Ian Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hyundai Merchant Marine CO Ltd
Represented By: Maya Basilia Barba
Represented By: John David Giffin
Represented By: Connor M Trafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Albert E Peacock, III
Represented By: Juliette Bowen McCullough
Represented By: Randolph H Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Shine Shipping Ltd
Represented By: Neil B. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Shine International Transportation (Hong Kong) Ltd
Represented By: Neil B. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ROES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: HMM Co Ltd.
Represented By: Maya Basilia Barba
Represented By: Connor M Trafton
Represented By: John David Giffin
Represented By: Connor Michael Trafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Roes 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
Represented By: Albert E Peacock, III
Represented By: Genine Go Cumba
Represented By: David G. Bayles
Represented By: Glen R Piper
Represented By: Juliette Bowen McCullough
Represented By: Malcolm S McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hapag-Lloyd A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Yang Ming (America) Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Roes 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?