Backer EHP Inc. et al v. M/V One Apus et al
Plaintiff: Backer EHP Inc. and HDI Global Insurance Company
Defendant: M/V ONE Apus, Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft, HMM Co Ltd., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation, CH Robinson International, Inc., CH Robinson Freight Services Ltd doing business as Christal Lines and Does 1 through 15
Case Number: 1:2022cv06461
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1701 Violation of Shipping Act of 1984 (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:21-cv-09605. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
July 29, 2022 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (vba)
July 29, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
July 29, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
July 29, 2022 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
July 29, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
July 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
June 16, 2022 Filing 11 TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3028, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer. Case transferred electronically 6/17/2022. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Backer EHP Inc. and HDI Global Insurance Company HDI Global Insurance Company, Backer EHP Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to CH Robinson Freight Services Ltd, CH Robinson International, Inc.. (Brucculeri, Frank) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-07655 CJC(ASx) (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Backer EHP Inc., HDI Global Insurance Company (Rose, Bradley) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Backer EHP Inc. and HDI Global Insurance Company All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Bradley Rose added to party HDI Global Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Rose, Bradley) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Backer EHP Inc., HDI Global Insurance Company. (Rose, Bradley) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32464499 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Backer EHP Inc. and HDI Global Insurance Company Backer EHP Inc.. (Attorney Bradley Rose added to party Backer EHP Inc.(pty:pla))(Rose, Bradley) [Transferred from California Central on 7/29/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backer EHP Inc. et al v. M/V One Apus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Backer EHP Inc.
Represented By: Frank C Brucculeri
Represented By: Bradley Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley Rose
Represented By: Frank C Brucculeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ONE Apus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM Co Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH Robinson International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH Robinson Freight Services Ltd doing business as Christal Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?