Shinagawa et al v. Bui et al
Plaintiff: Mariko Shinagawa
Defendant: Sandy Lui Bui, United States Of America, Anca Rosca Califano, Sarina Aliza Shuster, Roniel Weinberg, Allan W. Ho, Anna Grigoryan, Shan Fang, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital and NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital
Case Number: 1:2022cv10173
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of United States Of America..(Jude, Jennifer)
January 18, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan E Verbos on behalf of Anca Rosca Califano..(Verbos, Megan)
January 18, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mia Laine Martinez on behalf of Anca Rosca Califano..(Martinez, Mia Laine)
January 18, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura M. Papa on behalf of Anca Rosca Califano..(Papa, Laura)
January 18, 2023 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Anca Rosca Califano..(Papa, Laura)
January 17, 2023 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Shan Fang served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. Service was accepted by Shan Fang, R.N.. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
January 11, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan E Verbos on behalf of Anna Grigoryan..(Verbos, Megan)
January 11, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mia Laine Martinez on behalf of Anna Grigoryan..(Martinez, Mia Laine)
January 10, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura M. Papa on behalf of Anna Grigoryan..(Papa, Laura)
January 10, 2023 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Anna Grigoryan..(Papa, Laura)
January 9, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan E Verbos on behalf of Sarina Aliza Shuster..(Verbos, Megan)
January 9, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mia Laine Martinez on behalf of Sarina Aliza Shuster..(Martinez, Mia Laine)
January 9, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura M. Papa on behalf of Sarina Aliza Shuster..(Papa, Laura)
January 9, 2023 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sarina Aliza Shuster..(Papa, Laura)
January 9, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mia Laine Martinez on behalf of Roniel Weinberg..(Martinez, Mia Laine)
January 9, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan E Verbos on behalf of Roniel Weinberg..(Verbos, Megan)
January 5, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura M. Papa on behalf of Roniel Weinberg..(Papa, Laura)
January 5, 2023 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Roniel Weinberg..(Papa, Laura)
January 4, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan E Verbos on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Verbos, Megan)
January 3, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mia Laine Martinez on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Martinez, Mia Laine)
January 3, 2023 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Allan W. Ho served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. Service was accepted by Mr. Joseph, Doorman. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 30, 2022 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Anna Grigoryan served on 12/23/2022, answer due 1/13/2023. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Co-Tenant. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 30, 2022 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Roniel Weinberg served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. Service was accepted by Aliza Weinberg, Wife. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 29, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura M. Papa on behalf of NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Papa, Laura)
December 29, 2022 Filing 31 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, . Document filed by Anca Rosca Califano, Sarina Aliza Shuster..(Papa, Laura)
December 29, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Papa, Laura)
December 27, 2022 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,, served. United States Of America served on 12/19/2022, answer due 2/17/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 20, 2022 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. Service was accepted by Mrs. Pinnock, Clerk. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 20, 2022 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital served on 12/7/2022, answer due 12/28/2022. Service was accepted by Mrs. Pinnock, Paralegal. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 20, 2022 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Sarina Aliza Shuster served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. Service was accepted by Mrs. Pinnock, Clerk. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 20, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Anca Rosca Califano served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. Service was accepted by Mrs. Voreen, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 20, 2022 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,, served. United States Of America served on 12/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. Service was accepted by Derick Mayers, Attorney for Defendant. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 20, 2022 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Sandy Lui Bui served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. Service was accepted by W. Fong, Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually); Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shan Fang..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anna Grigoryan..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allan W. Ho..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anca Rosca Califano..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandy Lui Bui..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarina Aliza Shuster..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roniel Weinberg..(pc)
December 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 30, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The New York And Presbyterian Hospital, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shan Fang, R.N., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anna Grigoryan, P.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allan W. Ho, M.D., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roniel Weinberg, M.D., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sarina Aliza Shuster, P.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anca Rosca Califano, M.D., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States Of America, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sandy Lui Bui, M.D., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years)..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nyberg, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandy Lui Bui, Anca Rosca Califano, Shan Fang, Anna Grigoryan, Allan W. Ho, NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, Sarina Aliza Shuster, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, United States Of America, Roniel Weinberg. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27022704)Document filed by Mariko Shinagawa(Individually), Mariko Shinagawa(as Mother and Natural Guardian of K.D.S., an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SF-95 Submissions 8.20.21, #2 Exhibit Supplemental SF-95 Submissions 5.17.22).(Nyberg, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinagawa et al v. Bui et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariko Shinagawa
Represented By: Christopher Michael Nyberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Lui Bui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anca Rosca Califano
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Represented By: Megan E Verbos
Represented By: Mia Laine Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarina Aliza Shuster
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Represented By: Megan E Verbos
Represented By: Mia Laine Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roniel Weinberg
Represented By: Megan E Verbos
Represented By: Mia Laine Martinez
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan W. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Grigoryan
Represented By: Megan E Verbos
Represented By: Mia Laine Martinez
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Fang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Represented By: Megan E Verbos
Represented By: Mia Laine Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewYork-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Represented By: Megan E Verbos
Represented By: Mia Laine Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?