He v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Xuejie He
Defendant: United States of America, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, State of New Jersey, State of New York, Union City Police Department, New Jersey, Guttbenberg Police Department, Chasan Lamparello Mallon & Cappuzzo, PC, Hudson Hospital OPCO LLC, Carepoint Health-Christ Hospital, Hudson County Prosecutor's Office, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Taobao, Aslan Aviation Serviecs (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC, Coalition for the Homeless, Catholic Charities Community Services Center, New York City, New York City Human Resources Administration, New York City Rescue Mission, Episcopal Church, Trinity Episcopal Church Parish Center, New York-Presbyterian Foundation Inc., New York Presbyterian Hospital, New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, Weill Cornell Medical, Cantonese Interpreter NY-PLMH, Modern Medical, PC, Affinity Health Plan Inc., Centene Corporation, Fidelis Care, New York City Police Department, New York City Police Department 109th Precinct, New York City Police Department 120th Precinct, New York City Police Department 121th Precinct, Garden of Hope, New York City Transit Authority, Transit Adjudication Bureau, New York City Department of Transportation, New York City Department of Design and Construction, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, Mount Sinai Health System Inc., Mount Sinai Beth Israel, Mount Sinai West, Richmond University Medical Center, Office of the New York City Comptroller, New York University, New York University College of Dentistry, Metropolitan Dental Associates, Legal Services NYC, The Legal Aid Society, New York City Marshals, CAMBA, Inc., City University of New York, Borough of Manhattan Community College, Renata V. Weber, Joan M. Kenney, Doris Ling-Cohan, Lizbeth Gonzalez, Matthew F. Cooper, Louis L. Stanton, Barrington D. Parker, Peter W. Hall, Christopher F. Droney, Kimberley Slade, Remy Smith, Li Yanfen, Mash Jim, Liufeng Chen, John Doe Jim, Hingsze Cho, John Doe A, New York State Unified Court System, New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, Giachetta, Kenneth (#80), Marshal, New York State Department of Labor, CL Supermarket Inc., Nai Brother Inc., Ying Ji Chang Fen Inc., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Duane Reade Inc., New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, New York City Police Department 1th Precinct, New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, Molina Healthcare, Inc., Affinity by Molina Healthcare, Inc., Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, Yanfen Li and Jim Mash
Case Number: 1:2023cv03214
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Reconsideration re #8 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #6 Order of Dismissal,. filed by, Xuejie He. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 8. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/8/2023) (rro)
May 5, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Xuejie He, Re: in Response to Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Xuejie He. (sc)
May 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION, Re: for Reconsideration re; #6 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Xuejie He.(sc)
May 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #6 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Xuejie He. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 15855. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp)
May 5, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #7 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
May 5, 2023 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by, Xuejie He were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/28/2023) (jca)
April 26, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Affinity by Molina Healthcare, Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Aslan Aviation Serviecs (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Borough of Manhattan Community College, CAMBA, Inc., CL Supermarket Inc., Cantonese Interpreter NY-PLMH, Carepoint Health-Christ Hospital, Catholic Charities Community Services Center, Centene Corporation, Chasan Lamparello Mallon & Cappuzzo, PC, Liufeng Chen, Hingsze Cho, City University of New York, Coalition for the Homeless, Matthew F. Cooper, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC, Christopher F. Droney, Duane Reade Inc., Episcopal Church, Fidelis Care, Garden of Hope, Lizbeth Gonzalez, Guttbenberg Police Department, Peter W. Hall, Hudson County Prosecutor's Office, Hudson Hospital OPCO LLC, Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, Joan M. Kenney, Legal Services NYC, Yanfen Li, Doris Ling-Cohan, Jim Mash, Metropolitan Dental Associates, Modern Medical, PC, Molina Healthcare, Inc., Mount Sinai Beth Israel, Mount Sinai Health System Inc., Mount Sinai West, Nai Brother Inc., New York City, New York City Department of Design and Construction, New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, New York City Department of Transportation, New York City Human Resources Administration, New York City Marshals, New York City Police Department, New York City Police Department 109th Precinct, New York City Police Department 120th Precinct, New York City Police Department 121th Precinct, New York City Police Department 1th Precinct, New York City Rescue Mission, New York City Transit Authority, New York Presbyterian Hospital, New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, New York State Department of Labor, New York State Unified Court System, New York University, New York University College of Dentistry, New York-Presbyterian Foundation Inc., Office of the New York City Comptroller, Barrington D. Parker, Richmond University Medical Center, Kimberley Slade, Remy Smith, Louis L. Stanton, State of New Jersey, State of New York, Taobao, The Legal Aid Society, Transit Adjudication Bureau, Trinity Episcopal Church Parish Center, Union City Police Department, New Jersey, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States of America, Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Renata V. Weber, Weill Cornell Medical, Ying Ji Chang Fen Inc. amending #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Xuejie He. Related document: #1 Complaint.(sc) Modified on 4/27/2023 (sc).
April 26, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Affinity Health Plan Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Aslan Aviation Serviecs (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Borough of Manhattan Community College, CAMBA, Inc., CL Supermarket Inc., Cantonese Interpreter NY-PLMH, Carepoint Health-Christ Hospital, Catholic Charities Community Services Center, Centene Corporation, Chasan Lamparello Mallon & Cappuzzo, PC, Liufeng Chen, Hingsze Cho, City University of New York, Coalition for the Homeless, Matthew F. Cooper, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC, John Doe A, John Doe Jim, Christopher F. Droney, Duane Reade Inc., Episcopal Church, Fidelis Care, Garden of Hope, Giachetta, Kenneth (#80), Marshal, Lizbeth Gonzalez, Guttbenberg Police Department, Peter W. Hall, Hudson County Prosecutor's Office, Hudson Hospital OPCO LLC, Mash Jim, Joan M. Kenney, Legal Services NYC, Doris Ling-Cohan, Metropolitan Dental Associates, Modern Medical, PC, Mount Sinai Beth Israel, Mount Sinai Health System Inc., Mount Sinai West, Nai Brother Inc., New York City, New York City Department of Design and Construction, New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, New York City Department of Transportation, New York City Human Resources Administration, New York City Marshals, New York City Police Department, New York City Police Department 109th Precinct, New York City Police Department 120th Precinct, New York City Police Department 121th Precinct, New York City Police Department 1th Precinct, New York City Rescue Mission, New York City Transit Authority, New York Presbyterian Hospital, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, New York State Department of Labor, New York State Unified Court System, New York University, New York University College of Dentistry, New York-Presbyterian Foundation Inc., New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, Office of the New York City Comptroller, Barrington D. Parker, Richmond University Medical Center, Kimberley Slade, Remy Smith, Louis L. Stanton, State of New Jersey, State of New York, Taobao, The Legal Aid Society, Transit Adjudication Bureau, Trinity Episcopal Church Parish Center, Union City Police Department, New Jersey, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States of America, Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Renata V. Weber, Weill Cornell Medical, Li Yanfen, Ying Ji Chang Fen Inc. (kh)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES without prejudice the Complaint in this case. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit an amended complaint in line with the above by June 20, 2023, which is sixty days from the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by this date, dismissal of this case shall be with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/21/2023) (rro)
April 21, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2023. (rro)
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Xuejie He consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Xuejie He. (sac)
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Affinity Health Plan Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Aslan Aviation Serviecs (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Borough of Manhattan Community College, CAMBA, Inc., CL Supermarket Inc., Cantonese Interpreter NY-PLMH, Carepoint Health-Christ Hospital, Catholic Charities Community Services Center, Centene Corporation, Chasan Lamparello Mallon & Cappuzzo, PC, Liufeng Chen, Hingsze Cho, City University of New York, Coalition for the Homeless, Matthew F. Cooper, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC, John Doe A, John Doe Jim, Christopher F. Droney, Duane Reade Inc., Episcopal Church, Fidelis Care, Garden of Hope, Giachetta, Kenneth (#80), Marshal, Lizbeth Gonzalez, Guttbenberg Police Department, Peter W. Hall, Hudson County Prosecutor's Office, Hudson Hospital OPCO LLC, Mash Jim, Joan M. Kenney, Legal Services NYC, Doris Ling-Cohan, Metropolitan Dental Associates, Modern Medical, PC, Mount Sinai Beth Israel, Mount Sinai Health System Inc., Mount Sinai West, Nai Brother Inc., New York City, New York City Department of Design and Construction, New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, New York City Department of Transportation, New York City Human Resources Administration, New York City Marshals, New York City Police Department, New York City Police Department 109th Precinct, New York City Police Department 120th Precinct, New York City Police Department 121th Precinct, New York City Police Department 1th Precinct, New York City Rescue Mission, New York City Transit Authority, New York Presbyterian Hospital, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, New York State Department of Labor, New York State Unified Court System, New York University, New York University College of Dentistry, New York-Presbyterian Foundation Inc., New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital, Office of the New York City Comptroller, Barrington D. Parker, Richmond University Medical Center, Kimberley Slade, Remy Smith, Louis L. Stanton, State of New Jersey, State of New York, Taobao, The Legal Aid Society, Transit Adjudication Bureau, Trinity Episcopal Church Parish Center, Union City Police Department, New Jersey, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States of America, Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Renata V. Weber, Weill Cornell Medical, Li Yanfen, Ying Ji Chang Fen Inc. (Filing Fee $402.00, Receipt Number 15176) Document filed by Xuejie He. (sac)
April 18, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
April 18, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: He v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuejie He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union City Police Department, New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guttbenberg Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasan Lamparello Mallon & Cappuzzo, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Hospital OPCO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carepoint Health-Christ Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson County Prosecutor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba Group Holding Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taobao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aslan Aviation Serviecs (Shanghai) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coalition for the Homeless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities Community Services Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Human Resources Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Rescue Mission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Episcopal Church Parish Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York-Presbyterian Foundation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Presbyterian Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weill Cornell Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantonese Interpreter NY-PLMH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Medical, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Health Plan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelis Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department 109th Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department 120th Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department 121th Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garden of Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit Adjudication Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Design and Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Sinai Health System Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Sinai Beth Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Sinai West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the New York City Comptroller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York University College of Dentistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Dental Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Services NYC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Legal Aid Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City University of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Manhattan Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renata V. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan M. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Ling-Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizbeth Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew F. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis L. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter W. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher F. Droney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Yanfen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mash Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liufeng Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hingsze Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Unified Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giachetta, Kenneth (#80), Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CL Supermarket Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nai Brother Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ying Ji Chang Fen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Reade Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department 1th Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity by Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanfen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Mash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?