Caldwell et al v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Kyle M. Caldwell, Donald C. Finley, Ramzan J. Alli, Raymond Bayron, James W. Bookman, Gib J. Brown, Christopher Carpenter, Robert L. Carson, Gregory D. Davis, Jashmal N. Gerrald, Samuel Johnson, Nicole Lawtone-Bowles, Monique Liverman, Dwight O. McDonald, Anthony W. OBrien, Garratte A. Peniston, Kashmir T. Peterson, Joseph E. Ray, John Roseboro, Terry J. Rowe, Marvin Smith, Michael A. Taylor, Richard R. Vargas, Eyon A. Williams, Richard B. Williams, Carl E. Young, Tahir H. Young, Luis Vicenty, George L Kennedy and Richard Merced
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2023cv03899
Filed: May 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by George L Kennedy, Richard Merced. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Pordy, Hope)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Luis Vicenty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Pordy, Hope)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/21/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 09/12/2022) (sge)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Request GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to July 28, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/5/2023) (jca)
June 5, 2023 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File defendant's response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Laura C. Williams dated June 5, 2023. Document filed by City of New York..(Williams, Laura)
June 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Christine Williams on behalf of City of New York..(Williams, Laura)
June 5, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of New York answer due 7/28/2023. (jca)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Rachel Beth Lite Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Rachel Beth Lite Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Rachel Beth Lite Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27769126. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ramzan J. Alli, Raymond Bayron, James W. Bookman, Gib J. Brown, Kyle M. Caldwell, Christopher Carpenter, Robert L. Carson, Gregory D. Davis, Donald C. Finley, Jashmal N. Gerrald, Samuel Johnson, Nicole Lawtone-Bowles, Monique Liverman, Dwight O. McDonald, Anthony W. OBrien, Garratte A. Peniston, Kashmir T. Peterson, Joseph E. Ray, John Roseboro, Terry J. Rowe, Marvin Smith, Michael A. Taylor, Richard R. Vargas, Eyon A. Williams, Richard B. Williams, Carl E. Young, Tahir H. Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing).(Lerner, Rachel)
May 22, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27769062. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ramzan J. Alli, Raymond Bayron, James W. Bookman, Gib J. Brown, Kyle M. Caldwell, Christopher Carpenter, Robert L. Carson, Gregory D. Davis, Donald C. Finley, Jashmal N. Gerrald, Samuel Johnson, Nicole Lawtone-Bowles, Monique Liverman, Dwight O. McDonald, Anthony W. OBrien, Garratte A. Peniston, Kashmir T. Peterson, Joseph E. Ray, John Roseboro, Terry J. Rowe, Marvin Smith, Michael A. Taylor, Richard R. Vargas, Eyon A. Williams, Richard B. Williams, Carl E. Young, Tahir H. Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Virginia Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit Washington Certificate of Good Standing).(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 22, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Rachel Beth Lite Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Rachel Beth Lite Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27769126. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
May 22, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27769062. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
May 18, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. City of New York served on 5/16/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. Service was accepted by Ariton Marke, authorized to accept. Document filed by Samuel Johnson; Marvin Smith; Christopher Carpenter; Carl E. Young; Kashmir T. Peterson; Donald C. Finley; Michael A. Taylor; Kyle M. Caldwell; Joseph E. Ray; Richard R. Vargas; Garratte A. Peniston; Monique Liverman; Tahir H. Young; Richard B. Williams; Gib J. Brown; Ramzan J. Alli; Gregory D. Davis; Nicole Lawtone-Bowles; Terry J. Rowe; Dwight O. McDonald; Anthony W. OBrien; Robert L. Carson; Raymond Bayron; Eyon A. Williams; John Roseboro; Jashmal N. Gerrald; James W. Bookman..(Pordy, Hope)
May 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Ramzan J. Alli, Raymond Bayron, James W. Bookman, Gib J. Brown, Kyle M. Caldwell, Christopher Carpenter, Robert L. Carson, Gregory D. Davis, Donald C. Finley, Jashmal N. Gerrald, Samuel Johnson, Nicole Lawtone-Bowles, Monique Liverman, Dwight O. McDonald, Anthony W. OBrien, Garratte A. Peniston, Kashmir T. Peterson, Joseph E. Ray, John Roseboro, Terry J. Rowe, Marvin Smith, Michael A. Taylor, Richard R. Vargas, Eyon A. Williams, Richard B. Williams, Carl E. Young, Tahir H. Young..(Block, Sarah)
May 10, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(jgo)
May 10, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 10, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 10, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Civil Cover Sheet).(Pordy, Hope)
May 9, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Ramzan J. Alli, Raymond Bayron, James W. Bookman, Gib J. Brown, Kyle M. Caldwell, Christopher Carpenter, Robert L. Carson, Gregory D. Davis, Donald C. Finley, Jashmal N. Gerrald, Samuel Johnson, Nicole Lawtone-Bowles, Monique Liverman, Dwight O. McDonald, Anthony W. OBrien, Garratte A. Peniston, Kashmir T. Peterson, Joseph E. Ray, John Roseboro, Terry J. Rowe, Marvin Smith, Michael A. Taylor, Richard R. Vargas, Eyon A. Williams, Richard B. Williams, Carl E. Young, Tahir H. Young..(Pordy, Hope)
May 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27718244)Document filed by Samuel Johnson, Marvin Smith, Christopher Carpenter, Carl E. Young, Kashmir T. Peterson, Donald C. Finley, Michael A. Taylor, Kyle M. Caldwell, Joseph E. Ray, Richard R. Vargas, Garratte A. Peniston, Monique Liverman, Tahir H. Young, Richard B. Williams, Gib J. Brown, Ramzan J. Alli, Gregory D. Davis, Nicole Lawtone-Bowles, Terry J. Rowe, Dwight O. McDonald, Anthony W. OBrien, Robert L. Carson, Raymond Bayron, Eyon A. Williams, John Roseboro, Jashmal N. Gerrald, James W. Bookman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms).(Pordy, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell et al v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle M. Caldwell
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C. Finley
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramzan J. Alli
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Bayron
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Bookman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gib J. Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Carpenter
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Carson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory D. Davis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jashmal N. Gerrald
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Lawtone-Bowles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Liverman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight O. McDonald
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony W. OBrien
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garratte A. Peniston
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashmir T. Peterson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Ray
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roseboro
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry J. Rowe
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Smith
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Taylor
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R. Vargas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eyon A. Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B. Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E. Young
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahir H. Young
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Vicenty
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L Kennedy
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Merced
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Laura Christine Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?