Pimentel v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Heriberto Pimentel
Defendant: Target Corporation, Target Brands, Target, Target Stores, Inc. and Kingsbridge Associates
Case Number: 1:2023cv08502
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling Initial Pretrial Conference served on Plaintiff on 10/5/23. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Target, Target Brands, Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc...(Spitz, Alice)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/5/2023) (jca)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by Target, Target Brands, Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc...(Spitz, Alice)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Target, Target Brands, Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc...(Spitz, Alice)
September 29, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
September 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alice Spitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spitz, Alice)
September 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of The State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 808892/2023E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28344969).Document filed by Target, Target Brands, Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Demand for Total Damages, #4 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel, #5 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel, #6 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel, #7 Exhibit Easement Agreement, #8 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel).(Spitz, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pimentel v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Brands
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsbridge Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?