Parada De Satre et al v. Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcela Stephannie Satre, Jared S. Satre, (Minor Child) A.S., Marcela Stephanie Parada De Satre and A.S.
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc, Walgreen Co. and WALMART INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10526
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 12/7/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 12/7/2023 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amy Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2024.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that: I. MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ACTION: 1. The cases transferred to this Court by the Panel as Member Cases of this multidistrict litigation action ("MDL"), and any related cases that are filed in the Southern District of New York, shall be referred to collectively as In re Acetaminophen ASD-ADHD Products Liability Litigation, Docket No. 22md3043 (DLC). These actions and any future actions so transferred and filed are hereby consolidated for all pretrial purposes without the need for future motions or orders. 2. No action taken hereunder shall have the effect of making any person, firm, or corporation a party to any action in which the person or entity has not been named, served, or added as such in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. II. MDL DOCKET AND MEMBER CASE DOCKETS: 3. An MDL docket is hereby established for the MDL proceedings. The MDL docket shall be Civil Action No. 22md3043 (DLC). This Order shall be docketed by the Clerk in the MDL Docket herein established. The Clerk shall maintain a separate docket for each of the Member Cases and filings shall be docketed therein in accordance with the regular procedures of the Clerk of this Court except as modified by Sections III and V of this Order. III. NEWLY FILED OR TRANSFERRED ACTIONS: 4. When an action that relates to the same subject matter as the MDL is hereafter filed in or transferred to this Court and assigned to the undersigned, it shall be a Member Case in the MDL, and the Clerk of Court shall docket a copy of this Order in the separate docket for such action and make an appropriate entry in the MDL Docket. 5. The Court requests the assistance of counsel in calling to the attention of the Clerk the filing or transfer of any case which might properly be included in the MDL. IV. CAPTIONS: 6. Every pleading filed in the MDL, and in any Member Case included therein, shall bear the following caption, as further set forth herein. 7. When a pleading is intended to be applicable to all actions in the MDL, the caption shall state: "This Document Relates To: All Actions." When a pleading is not intended to apply to all such actions, the docket number for each Member Case to which it is intended to apply shall appear immediately after the words "This Document Relates To:" in the caption. V. FILING: 8. When a party files a document on ECF and the caption shows that is application to All Actions, the party shall file it in the MDL Docket. No other filing need be made. 9. When a party files a document on ECF and the caption shows that it is not applicable to All Actions, the party shall file it in the MDL Docket and in each Member Case docket to which it applies. 10. Unless otherwise orders, all documents shall be filed electronically via the Court's CM/ECF system, as further set forth herein. 11. All counsel shall register promptly for this Court's CM/ECF filing system. VI. SCHEDULE AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: 12. With the exception of Roberts v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc., No. 5:22cv5108 (W.D. Ark.) and Hatfield v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., No. 5:22cv5109 (W.D. Ark.), the deadlines for any defendant in any Member Case to file a responsive pleading to the complaint with which they were served pursuant to Rule 12, Fed. R. Civ. P., are hereby stayed. 13. A pretrial conference shall be held on November 17, 2022 at 2:30 P.M. at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, as further set forth herein. 14. All counsel who intend to appear at the November 17 conference shall file a letter notifying this Court of their intention by November 10, 2022. 15. All counsel appearing at the November 17 conference shall file a proposed case management plan on the MDL Docket by November 10, 2022. Counsel for the plaintiffs and the defendants are encouraged to coordinate amongst themselves and collectively submit proposed case management plans on behalf of all plaintiffs and all defendants, respectively. VII. THIS COURTS INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES: 16. Counsel shall consult this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases for instructions on how to proceed before this Court. 17. Pursuant to this Court's Individual Practices, communications with Chambers should be by letter, which shall not exceed two pages in length, filed electronically on ECF. Such letters shall be filed pursuant to Section V of this Order. 18. Pursuant to this Court's Individual Practices, at the time and reply is served on a motion, the moving party shall supply two courtesy copies of all motion papers, including those of their adversaries, to Chambers by mail or delivery to the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/18/2022) (tg)
December 7, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #3 Complaint, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing..(jgo)
December 7, 2023 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. (tg)
December 7, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Debra Nicole Guntner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marcela Stephannie Satre; WALMART INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Debra Nicole Guntner to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Origin code was not selected; Citizenship Defendant code was not selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 7, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jgo)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy Inc, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., WALMART INC., Walgreen Co.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28655969)Document filed by Jared S. Satre, A.S., Marcela Stephannie Satre..(Guntner, Debra)
December 4, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Debra Nicole Guntner to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Plaintiff Jared S. Satre must be listed on the party information section; the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 12/11/2023. (jgo)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guntner, Debra) Modified on 12/7/2023 (jgo).
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28639246)Document filed by Jared S. Satre, A.S., Marcela Stephannie Satre..(Guntner, Debra) Modified on 12/4/2023 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parada De Satre et al v. Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela Stephannie Satre
Represented By: Debra Nicole Guntner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared S. Satre
Represented By: Debra Nicole Guntner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: (Minor Child) A.S.
Represented By: Debra Nicole Guntner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela Stephanie Parada De Satre
Represented By: Debra Nicole Guntner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Debra Nicole Guntner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?