Jones v. Mount Vernon City Police Department
Plaintiff: |
Chuckie Jones |
Defendant: |
Rivera and John Doe |
Case Number: |
7:2013cv01042 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
White Plains Office |
County: |
Westchester |
Presiding Judge: |
Edgardo Ramos |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
85
OPINION & ORDER: Defendants' motion is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. On or before January 9, 2017, Plaintiff is to provide written explanation of his failures to attend the conferences scheduled this year for February 4, 2016, April 4, 2016, May 9, 2016, and June 17, 2016. If Plaintiff fails to file with the Court a sufficient explanation by that deadline, then Plaintiff's remaining claims will be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) on account of Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 71. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/6/2016) (lnl)
|
December 7, 2015 |
Filing
50
OPINION & ORDER re: 42 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shawn Harris, Rivera, Mount Vernon City Police Department. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 42 and to remove Officer Rivera and the John Doe defendants from the caption. The parties are directed to appear at an in-person status conference on February 4, 2016 at 10 a.m., at which time they should provide the Court with a completed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Finally, Plaintiff is reminded that it is his obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if his address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/7/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mml)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?