Mondelli v. Walmart Stores, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bridget Mondelli
Defendant: National Realty & Development Corp., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a "Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Corp." and Middletown I Resources LP
Case Number: 7:2020cv03564
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2020. (mml)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Noreen Calderin dated 6/30/2020 re: I have not been able to complete the amended pleadings and ask for a two week extension for same. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff may have until 7/1/20 for an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's counsel still needs to file a Notice of Appearance. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/30/2020) (mml)
June 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 6/9/2020. Plaintiff's counsel Noreen Calderin, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel John Petrowski, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Joshua Cohen appears telephonically. The Court directs Plaintiff's counsel to file a Notice of Appearance for this case. Case Management Plan signed. The Court schedules the next status conference for November 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by November 10, 2020; opposition due November 17, 2020. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Angie Shaw-Crockett) (wc)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any pre-motion conference in connection with a motion to amend or join additional parties must be requested by 7/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Deposition of parties and fact witnesses are to be completed by 10/2/2020. Counsel respectfully request that expert discovery be held in abeyance pending MSJ. Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. This case has been designated to the Honorable Judith C. McCarthy United States Magistrate Judge, for discovery disputes if the Court is unavailable. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/9/2020) (va)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Middletown I Resources LP, National Realty & Development Corp., Walmart Stores, Inc..(Petrowski, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall appear in a telephone conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on June 9, 2020 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877)3361839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. Initial Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Telephone Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel..(mml)
May 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Petrowski. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a "Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Corp.". The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Petrowski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Petrowski to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption; the incorrect Jury Demand code was selected; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Orange. Case Number: EF000262/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19744630).Document filed by National Realty & Development Corp., Middletown I Resources LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a "Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Corp.". (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Demand, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Response).(Petrowski, John)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Middletown I Resources LP, National Realty & Development Corp., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a "Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Corp.".(Petrowski, John)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart De Mexico, Other Affiliate Seiyu for Middletown I Resources LP, National Realty & Development Corp., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a "Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Corp.". Document filed by Middletown I Resources LP, National Realty & Development Corp., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a "Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Corp."..(Petrowski, John)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Petrowski, John) Modified on 5/8/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mondelli v. Walmart Stores, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Mondelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Realty & Development Corp.
Represented By: John Petrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a "Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Corp."
Represented By: John Petrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middletown I Resources LP
Represented By: John Petrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?