New York Life Insurance Company v. Kravitz et al
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Defendant: E.K., a Minor, Rose Conetta, S.K., a Minor, Daniel Conetta, Christopher Kravitz, S.K. and E.K.
Case Number: 7:2020cv06636
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Christopher Kravitz waiver sent on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Creed, Aimee)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S.K...(pc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to E.K...(pc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rose Conetta..(pc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Kravitz..(pc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Conetta..(pc)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aimee Leigh Creed. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: E.K., a Minor, S.K., a Minor.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Conetta, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Creed, Aimee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rose Conetta, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Creed, Aimee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to E.K., a Minor, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Creed, Aimee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S.K., a Minor, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Creed, Aimee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Kravitz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Creed, Aimee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company..(Creed, Aimee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Creed, Aimee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Conetta, Rose Conetta, Christopher Kravitz, E.K., a Minor, S.K., a Minor. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21229084)Document filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Creed, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Life Insurance Company v. Kravitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K., a Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Conetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.K., a Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Conetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Aimee Leigh Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?