Romano v. Ulrich et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Romano
Defendant: Kevin Ulrich, Joseph Cianci, Gary Coviello, Daniel Leonard, Roy Bell and Gregory Carney
Case Number: 1:2013cv00633
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Leslie G. Foschio
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECISION AND ORDER granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 70 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/28/2017. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case. (Copy of this Decision and Order mailed to Plaintiff, Anthony Romano, on 8/29/2017.) (LMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER denying 55 Motion to Appoint CounselPlaintiff's Motion to Compel (Docket No. 34) is denied in part as stated in the Order. Plaintiff's Motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 55) is denied.Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff at Elmira Correctional Facility by Chambers. So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/22/2016. (DRH)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; reassigning the action to Magistrate Judge Scott; adding Jeffrey Hazard, Brian Feeney, Jeffrey Lacapruccia, Jeffrey Miller and Mark Cunningham as defendants; the Clerk of Court shall cause the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the Summons, complaint this Order upon the named defendants; a copy of this order shall be forwarded to Michael Russo, Assistant Attorney General in Charge and the defedants are directed to answer the complaint. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 10/14/13. (SG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romano v. Ulrich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cianci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Coviello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?