Gallagher v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Erin Gallagher
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00038
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2019 11:00 AM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/5/2019. (RAZ)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/1/2019. (CMD)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Consent to Change Attorney by Erin Gallagher. (Peters, Raymond)
January 8, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
January 8, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
January 8, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (Briandi, Jody)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Briandi, Jody)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 813161/2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3324876), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court document list, #2 Exhibit summons & complaint, #3 Exhibit Target's Answer, #4 Exhibit entity info, #5 Exhibit plaintiff's response to specific relief, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service)(Briandi, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Jody E. Briandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: Zandra D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Raymond W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?