Nowicki v YRC Worldwide, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Nowicki
Defendant: Screen Tight, YRC Worldwide Inc. a/k/a YRC Freight, YRC Worldwide Inc. and YRC Freight
Case Number: 1:2019cv00124
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #4 MOTION to Remand , #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lawrence Nowicki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Business record Screen Tight, #2 Exhibit B - Taxable search Screen Tight, #3 Exhibit C - Business entities online Screen Tight, #4 Exhibit D - Business entities G2 Corporation, #5 Exhibit E - Taxable search G2 Corporation, #6 Exhibit F - Google Map Screen Tight, #7 Exhibit G - EEOC Sues G2 Corporation, #8 Certificate of Service)(Collins, Ethan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan William Collins on behalf of Lawrence Nowicki (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Collins, Ethan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D. Cantone on behalf of YRC Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cantone, Peter)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by YRC Worldwide Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screen Tight promotional materials, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State searches, #3 Exhibit C - Prior federal court filing, #4 Exhibit D - Contact information, #5 Certificate of Service)(Cantone, Peter)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Lawrence Nowicki. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service upon YRC Worldwide, Inc., #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service upon Screen Tight, #5 Exhibit D - YRC Answer, #6 Exhibit E - Letter from Collins to Screen Tight, dated 01/17/2019, #7 Certificate of Service)(Capizzi, Samuel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YRC Worldwide Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Will, Pauline)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
January 25, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
January 25, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YRC Worldwide Inc. a/k/a YRC Freight from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 815565/2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3342544), filed by YRC Worldwide Inc. a/k/a YRC Freight. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendant YRC's Answer, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Demand for Relief, #4 Exhibit Index of Filed Documents, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Will, Pauline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowicki v YRC Worldwide, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Nowicki
Represented By: Ethan William Collins
Represented By: Samuel James Capizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screen Tight
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc. a/k/a YRC Freight
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Freight
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?