Santos v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Byron Santos
Defendant: Kelly, Kubik, Pawlak, Hopf and Jones
Case Number: 1:2019cv01042
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Plaintiff has until October 10, 2019 to either submit a signed Authorization form or pay the filing fee. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/13/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff, along with a blank Authorization form. (KLH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Santos.(KLH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT administratively terminating this action. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/20/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff.(KLH)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee; that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than 30 days from the date of this order; and that such writing must include either a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with a signed authorization form or the $400.00 fee. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/19/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff, along with a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis and authorization form. (KLH)
August 7, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including Privacy Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KLH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Santos.(KLH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hopf, Jones, Kelly, Kubik, Pawlak, filed by Byron Santos.(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?