Peters, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant Eastman Kodak Company v. Continenza et al
Plaintiff: LOUIS PETERS, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY and Louis Peters
Defendant: JAMES V. CONTINENZA, DAVID E. BULLWINKLE, ROGER W. BYRD, RICHARD TODD BRADLEY, GEORGE KARFUNKEL, PHILLIPE D. KATZ, JASON NEW, RANDY VANDAGRIFF and EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
Petitioner: Herbert Silverberg
Case Number: 6:2021cv06621
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A Straus on behalf of Jason New (Straus, Paul)
November 19, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by David Mitchell Zensky on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2021 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by Herbert Silverberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey S. Abraham in Support of Plaintiff Silverbergs Cross-Motion for Organizing the Two Related Shareholder Derivative Actions, #2 Exhibit 8 - Peters Docket, #3 Exhibit 9 - Memo in Support of Continenza's Motion to Dismiss Insider Trading Claim, #4 Exhibit 10 - Memo in Support of Option Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 11 - Memo in Support of Eastman Kodak's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit 12 - Memo in Support of Karfunkel's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 13 - In re Activision Blizzard Oral Argument Transcript, #8 Exhibit 14 - Kodak's March 16, 2021 10-K, #9 Exhibit 15 - Decision in Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund v. Icahn, #10 Exhibit 16 - Order in Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund v. Icahn)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2021 Filing 61 Letter filed by Eastman Kodak Company as to George Karfunkel, David E. Bullwinkle, Phillipe D. Katz, Randy Vandagriff, James V. Continenza, Jason New, Roger W. Byrd, Eastman Kodak Company, Richard Todd Bradley re #49 MEMORANDUM. (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
November 16, 2021 Filing 60 TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by David M. Zensky. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/16/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 59 TEXT ORDER granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Eliot Lauer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Mary Grace W. Metcalfe. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 57 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by W. Alex Smith. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 56 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Avi Schick. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 55 TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Zachary L. Rowen. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 54 TEXT ORDER granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Goldwater. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 53 TEXT ORDER granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Timothy M. Haggerty. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Julia B. Mosse. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 51 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael S. Bosworth. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 9, 2021 Filing 50 DECLARATION re #49 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by Louis Peters CORRECTED [49-1] Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq. in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Cross-Motion of Herbert Silverberg and in Further Support of his Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Louis Peters. (Matarazzo, Hadley)
November 9, 2021 E-Filing Notification: Document missing signature in Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq. re #49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Action required: re-file document with proper signature using the Declaration event and link to #49 . (TF)
November 8, 2021 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff (In Opposition to Cross-Motion of Herbert Silverberg) filed by Louis Peters. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq. in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Cross-Motion of Herbert Silverberg and in Further Support of his Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Counsel, #2 Exhibit D to Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #3 Exhibit E to Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #4 Exhibit F to Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #5 Exhibit G to Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #6 Exhibit H to Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #7 Exhibit I to Supplemental Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq.)(Matarazzo, Hadley)
November 8, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Zachary L. Rowen ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4413099.) by Richard Todd Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Zachary L. Rowen's Admission Petition Form, #2 Zachary L. Rowen's Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Zachary L. Rowen Attorney's Oath, #4 Zachary L. Rowen's Civility Principles Oath, #5 Zachary L. Rowen's CM/ECF Registration Form)(Hammel, Jeff)
November 8, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Eliot Lauer ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4412739.) by Phillipe D. Katz. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 CM/ECF Registration Form)(Ferre, Hermann)
November 8, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of David M. Zensky ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4412727.) by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Nussbaum, Carolyn)
November 8, 2021 Filing 45 TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joshua J. Card. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/08/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 8, 2021 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Stern. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/08/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 8, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Andrew W. Goldwater ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4412488.) by David E. Bullwinkle, Randy Vandagriff. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Principal Oath, #5 ECF Registration)(Corngold, Eric)
November 8, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Timothy M. Haggerty ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4412451.) by David E. Bullwinkle, Randy Vandagriff. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Principal Oath, #5 ECF Registration)(Corngold, Eric)
November 8, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Julia B. Mosse ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4411891.) by Phillipe D. Katz. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 CM/ECF Registration Form)(Ferre, Hermann)
November 4, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Joshua J. Card ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4410505.) by Roger W. Byrd.(Mardian, Peter)
November 4, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Andrew W. Stern ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4410502.) by Roger W. Byrd.(Mardian, Peter)
November 4, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Mardian on behalf of Roger W. Byrd (Mardian, Peter)
November 4, 2021 Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J. Clark. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/04/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 4, 2021 Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Zachary S. Zwillinger. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/04/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 4, 2021 Filing 35 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by John P. Nowak. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/04/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 4, 2021 Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kevin C. Logue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/04/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 4, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Mary Grace W. Metcalfe ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4410288.) by George Karfunkel. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Petition and Other Documents)(Aaronson, Matthew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of W. Alex Smith ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4410279.) by George Karfunkel. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Petition and Other Documents)(Aaronson, Matthew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Avi Schick ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4410275.) by George Karfunkel. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Petition and Other Documents)(Aaronson, Matthew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Stacey A. Greenspan. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/04/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 4, 2021 Filing 29 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #24 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Michael S. Bosworth ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4409567.) . (Hammel, Jeff)
November 4, 2021 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Eric L. Zagar. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/04/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 4, 2021 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Lee D. Rudy. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/04/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 4, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Hermann Ferre on behalf of Phillipe D. Katz (Ferre, Hermann)
November 4, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Christopher J. Clark ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4409576.) by Richard Todd Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Christopher J. Clark's Admission Petition Form, #2 Christopher J. Clark's Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Christopher J. Clark Attorney's Oath, #4 Christopher J. Clark's Civility Principles Oath, #5 Christopher J. Clark's CM/ECF Registration Form)(Hammel, Jeff)
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Michael S. Bosworth ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4409567.) by Richard Todd Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Michael S. Bosworth's Admission Petition Form, #2 Michael S. Bosworth's Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Michael S. Bosworth Attorney's Oath, #4 Michael S. Bosworth's Civility Principles Oath, #5 Michael S. Bosworth's CM/ECF Registration Form)(Hammel, Jeff)
November 4, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff G. Hammel on behalf of Richard Todd Bradley (Hammel, Jeff)
November 4, 2021 E-Filing Notification: #24 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Michael S. Bosworth ACTION REQUIRED: Resubmit the Admission Petition Form indicating type of admission requested. Refile complete document using Docketing Event, Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Zachary S. Zwillinger ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4409342.) by James V. Continenza. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Attorney Database & ECF Registration Form, #5 WDNY Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath)(Berris, Katherine)
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of John P. Nowak ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4409340.) by James V. Continenza. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Attorney Database & ECF Registration Form, #5 WDNY Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath)(Berris, Katherine)
November 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Kevin C. Logue ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4409331.) by James V. Continenza. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Attorney Database & ECF Registration Form, #5 WDNY Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath)(Berris, Katherine)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Johnson Berris on behalf of James V. Continenza (Berris, Katherine)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Conroy on behalf of Jason New (Conroy, Christina)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eastman Kodak Company. (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Stacey A. Greenspan, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4408194.) by Louis Peters. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath (signature page only), #5 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Matarazzo, Hadley)
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Eric L. Zagar, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4408193.) by Louis Peters. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form with Ex. A, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath (signature page only), #5 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Matarazzo, Hadley)
November 2, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Lee D. Rudy, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4408182.) by Louis Peters. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form with Ex. A, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath (signature page only), #5 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Matarazzo, Hadley)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Aaronson on behalf of George Karfunkel (Aaronson, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Lindemuth on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Lindemuth, Stephanie)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn G. Nussbaum on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. McGuirk on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (McGuirk, Richard)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Owen Corngold on behalf of David E. Bullwinkle, Randy Vandagriff (Corngold, Eric)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #5 Stipulation filed by the parties. Counsel for any defendant who endorsed the stipulation but has not yet appeared in this matter must file a notice of appearance on or before November 8, 2021. Any defendant wishing to submit a response to the motion to consolidate and motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel must do so on or before November 8, 2021. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this Text Order on counsel for any defendant who has not yet appeared in this matter. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/25/2021. (MGB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding deadline to respond to complaint. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/25/2021. (MGB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding briefing schedule. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/25/2021. (MGB)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] Regarding Deadline to Respond by James V. Continenza. (Zwillinger, Zachary)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule re #2 Motion for Consolidation and Appointment by Louis Peters. (Matarazzo, Hadley)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff by Herbert Silverberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Klein, #2 Exhibit 1 - NY AG Filings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Peters Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 3 - July 2020 Forms 4, #5 Exhibit 4 - Silverberg Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - Dendreon Transcript, #7 Exhibit 6 - KTMC Website Page, #8 Exhibit 7 - Kodak Bylaws, #9 Exhibit 8 - AF&T Resume, #10 Memorandum in Support of Silverbergs Cross-Motion, for Organizing the Two Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and in Response to the Peters Motion, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Louis Peters. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #5 Memorandum in Support, #6 Proposed Order)(Matarazzo, Hadley)
October 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
October 5, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
October 5, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4378964, filed by LOUIS PETERS, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [8.13.20 demand], #2 Exhibit B [9.15.20 SC Report], #3 Exhibit C [11.6.20 Demand response], #4 Compl. Exhibit D [9.24.21 Def Status Rpt], #5 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachments)(Matarazzo, Hadley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant Eastman Kodak Company v. Continenza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS PETERS, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
Represented By: Hadley L. Matarazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Peters
Represented By: Eric L. Zagar
Represented By: Hadley L. Matarazzo
Represented By: Lee D. Rudy
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES V. CONTINENZA
Represented By: John P. Nowak
Represented By: Kevin C. Logue
Represented By: Zachary S. Zwillinger
Represented By: Katherine Johnson Berris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID E. BULLWINKLE
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Eric Owen Corngold
Represented By: Timothy Michael Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER W. BYRD
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Joshua J. Card
Represented By: Peter J Mardian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD TODD BRADLEY
Represented By: Christopher J. Clark
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Michael S. Bosworth
Represented By: Zachary L. Rowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE KARFUNKEL
Represented By: Avi D. Schick
Represented By: Mary Grace W. Metcalfe
Represented By: Matthew J. Aaronson
Represented By: William Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPE D. KATZ
Represented By: Eliot Lauer
Represented By: Hermann Ferre
Represented By: Julia B. Mosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON NEW
Represented By: Paul A Straus
Represented By: Christina M. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY VANDAGRIFF
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Eric Owen Corngold
Represented By: Timothy Michael Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: David Mitchell Zensky
Represented By: Richard A. McGuirk
Represented By: Stephanie Lindemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herbert Silverberg
Represented By: Michael Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?