Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC et al v Nordan Featured Case

Petitioners Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC and Blackwater Lodge and Training Center, Inc. petitioned for an Order directing Richard P. Nordan, as ancillary administrator for the separate estates of Stephen S. Helvenston, Mike R. Teague, Jerko Gerald Zovko, and Wesley J.K. Batalona to proceed with arbitration in accordance with the Independent Contractor Service Agreements entered into between the decedents and Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC. The lawsuit arises out of a March 31, 2004, incident in Fallujah, Iraq, in which Iraqi insurgents murdered the decedents, who were working for Blackwater Security and escorting a kitchen supply convoy.

Petitioner: Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC and Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc.
Respondent: Richard P. Nordan
Case Number: 2:2006cv00049
Filed: December 20, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: CURRITUCK
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the stay by this courts order of April 20, 2007 is LIFTED. Nordans Motion to Vacate Orders, or in the Alternative, Motion for Order of Dismissal and Lift of Stay on Court Proceedings is DENIED. Blackwaters Motion for Judgment on its Petition is ALLOWED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter Judgment as follows:The Tribunals decision reflected in Order 17 (DE-120), Exh. 22, hereby is CONFIRMED.This constitutes a final order in this case Number 2:06-CV-49-F, which the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close. Signed by Dennis Iavarone, Clerk of Court, by Susan Edwards Deputy on 1/21/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Seal Document 118 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 12/21/2010. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Seal Document cited in its Response to Respondent's Motion to Vacate at docket entry 108 . Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/15/2010. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 106 Motion to Seal Documents. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the documents attached as Exhibits 3, 4, 6-19, 21 and 22 to [DE-99]. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/15/10. (Lee, L.)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40
ORDER denying 35 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James C. Fox on 9/19/2007. CC:counsel (Deputy Clerk - SE, )
July 31, 2007 Filing 39
RESPONSE to Motion re 35 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Petition filed by Richard P. Nordan. (Bystrynski, William)
July 30, 2007 Filing 38
AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Nordan by Richard P. Nordan. (Coats, David)
June 13, 2007 Filing 34
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re 30 Notice of Appeal (Deputy Clerk - SE, )
May 22, 2007 Filing 31
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 30 Notice of Appeal (Deputy Clerk - SE, )
May 18, 2007 Filing 30
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Richard P. Nordan. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 366475. (Kirby, David)
May 16, 2007 Filing 29
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Ash on behalf of Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC, Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc. (Ash, Mark)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28
ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 20 Motion for relief from order, denying 25 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge James C. Fox on 5/11/2007. CC:counsel (Deputy Clerk - SE, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 23
Memorandum in Support of Richard P. Nordan's Motion for Relief from Judgment filed by Richard P. Nordan. (Coats, David)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. Blackwater's petition for order directing arbitration is ALLOWED (DE #1) and the parties are ORDERED to proceed with arbitration; this action is STAYED pending completion of the required arbitration. Signed by Judge James C. Fox on 4/20/2007. CC:counsel. (Deputy Clerk - SE, )
January 23, 2007 Filing 12
NOTICE of Appearance for non-district counsel Michael P. Socarras Filed by local counsel Kirk G. Warner on behalf of Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC, Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc. (Warner, Kirk)
December 21, 2006 Filing 4
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1. (Warner, Kirk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC et al v Nordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard P. Nordan
Represented By: David S. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?