The Mineo Corporation et al v. Rowe et al
Case Number: 2:2007cv00057
Filed: December 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of The Mineo Corporation, The Mineo Corporation Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Beverly Mineo and Francesco Mineo against 419 Trust Administrators, Inc., Niche Marketing, Inc., Niche Plan Sponsors, Inc., Judi Carsrud and Philip Rowe. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 9/8/2011. (Heath, D.)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 135 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 8/5/11. (Lee, L.)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 JUDGMENT in favor of The Mineo Corporation, The Mineo Corporation Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Beverly Mineo, Francesco Mineo against 419 Trust Administrators, Inc., Niche Marketing, Inc., Niche Plan Sponsors, Inc., Judi Carsrud, Philip Rowe. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court, on 3/4/2011. (Heath, D.)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 110 Joint Motion to Dismiss. IT APPEARING, Defendant American General Life Insurance Company is the only remaining defendant against whom entry of default has not been entered, and Defendant American General Life Insurance Company an d Plaintiffs have resolved their claims and counterclaims by a confidential settlement agreement; IT IS THEREFORE ADJUDGED, ORDERED AND DECREED that all counts asserted by Plaintiffs against American General Life Insurance Company and all Counterclaims by Defendant American General Life Insurance Company against Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 6/3/2010. (Heath, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mineo Corporation et al v. Rowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?