Felton-Miller v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Paula Felton-Miller
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2010cv00005
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: PERQUIMANS
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Reconsideration - Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/08/2011. (Baker, C.)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered November 17, 2010, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied and defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted. The decision of the commissioner is upheld and this matter is dismissed. Signed by Clerk of Court on 11/22/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER adopting 35 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and, granting 33 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/17/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Michael J. Astrue and 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Paula Felton-Miller. Objections to M&R due by 10/21/2010. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert Jones on 10/04/2010. Copies served electronically. (Attachments: # 1 M&R Notice) (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felton-Miller v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Felton-Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?