Sansotta et al v. Town of Nags Head et al
Plaintiff: Roc F Sansotta, Ralph S Tomita, Gloria H Tomita, Carole A. Shackelford, James Bregman, Linda Atsus and George D Rusin
Defendant: Town of Nags Head and Timothy Wilson
Case Number: 2:2010cv00029
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: DARE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER regarding 139 Motion for Bill of Costs: The defendant is awarded $350.00 in filing fee costs and $1,056.80 in transcript costs. Total costs in the amount of $1,406.80 are taxed against plaintiffs and shall be included in the judgment. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 1/25/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/25/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER - As to Plaintiff's seventh, eighth, ninth and tenth claims, the Court grants in part the Town's 81 motion for summary judgment. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's eleventh claim as unripe. The Court declines to exercise supple mental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' nine remaining claims and the Town's four counterclaims, and remands these claims and counterclaims along with any other pending motions to Dare County Superior Court. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 03/28/2012. (Skinner, J.)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 48 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Scrivener's Error, and 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by US District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/5/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiffs' motion to file a second amended complaint [D.E. 39] and orders plaintiffs to file their second amended complaint by December 10, 2010. Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint [D.E. 24] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 12/6/2010. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sansotta et al v. Town of Nags Head et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roc F Sansotta
Represented By: Keith P. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph S Tomita
Represented By: Keith P. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria H Tomita
Represented By: Keith P. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole A. Shackelford
Represented By: Keith P. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bregman
Represented By: Keith P. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Atsus
Represented By: Keith P. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George D Rusin
Represented By: Keith P. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Nags Head
Represented By: L. P. Hornthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?