Severn Peanut Co., Inc. et al v. Industrial Fumigant Co. et al
Plaintiff: |
Severn Peanut Co., Inc. and Meherrin Agriculture & Chemical Co. |
Defendant: |
Industrial Fumigant Co. and Rollins Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00014 |
Filed: |
April 8, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Northern Division Office |
County: |
NORTHAMPTON |
Presiding Judge: |
Terrence W. Boyle |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 22, 2014 |
Filing
177
ORDER: The plaintiffs' contributory negligence bars the remaining negligence claims in this matter. The Court enters summary judgment in favor of the defendants. All other pending motions remaining on the docket are denied as moot. The clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this matter. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/19/2014. (Fisher, M.)
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
152
ORDER GRANTING 141 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's order regarding the trial time limitations. The Court withdraws the time limitations as previously imposed subject to further consideration. The trial currently set in this matter for August 25, 2014, is hereby continued and will be reset by separate notice at a later date. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/16/2014. (Fisher, M.)
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing
144
ORDER DENYING 143 Defendants' Motion to Shorten the Response Time for the plaintiffs to respond to the 143 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Temporary Stay. (Fisher, M.)
|
March 17, 2014 |
Filing
101
ORDER DENYING 74 Defendants' Motion to Strike, and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 84 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted in favor of the defendants on the plaintiff's breach of contract claim. The remaining claims may proceed in their entirety. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/15/2014. (Fisher, M.)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
96
ORDER GRANTING 64 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Post-Disclosure Expert Testing and Supplemental Reports and Opinions. Any and all testing undertaken by the plaintiffs' expert witnesses subsequent to May 1, 2013, includin g but not limited to the testing undertaken in Memphis, Tennessee, on or about September 4, 2013, and any supplemental reports and/or opinions associated with such testing, is hereby EXCLUDED from evidence in this case. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/13/2014. Counsel is directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. (Fisher, M.)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
90
ORDER GRANTING 71 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Videos, and GRANTING 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Videos. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/5/2013. (Fisher, M.)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER DENYING 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and GRANTING 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/22/2013. Counsel is directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. (Fisher, M.)
|
November 14, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/14/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?