Jackson-Heard v. Elizabeth City State University et al
Plaintiff: Mary F. Jackson-Heard
Defendant: Elizabeth City State University and David Bejou
Case Number: 2:2012cv00008
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: PASQUOTANK
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [D.E. 31] is GRANTED and Defendants' Motion for Payment of Expert Fee [D.E. 32] is DENIED. The Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 9/13/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/15/2013. (Edwards, S.)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall retain the filing at Docket Entry 24 under permanent seal in accordance with Local Civil Rule 79.2, E.D.N.C. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/11/2013. (Edwards, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson-Heard v. Elizabeth City State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary F. Jackson-Heard
Represented By: James R. Theuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth City State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bejou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?