Stillwagon v Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: |
William C. Stillwagon |
Defendant: |
Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC, Rial Corporation, Alois Rieder and Richard Rieder |
Counter_claimant: |
Rial Corporation and Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC |
Counter_defendant: |
William C. Stillwagon |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00018 |
Filed: |
March 22, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Northern Division Office |
County: |
xxU.S. Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Dever |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
191
ORDER GRANTING: 190 Joint Motion to Dismiss for consent order . It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that; 1) The Defendants counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice; 2) All Orders of this Court remain in effect; and 3) The Court retains jurisdiction solely to enforce the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/7/2015. (O'Brien, C.)
|
February 4, 2015 |
Filing
186
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 142 Motion to Compel, 148 Motion to Compel, and 150 Motion to Compel; and GRANTING 146 Motion for Order to Show Cause and 152 Motion to Compel. In sum, the court GRANTS IN PART defendants' motions to compel an enlargement of time to depose Stillwagon 142 , to compel responses to defendants' third request for production 148 , and to compel Stillwagon's response to defendants' requests to admit 150 . Furthermore, the cour t GRANTS defendants' motions to show cause 146 and forreimbursement of costs 152 . Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/4/15. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (O'Brien, C.)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing
185
ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/8/14. (O'Brien, C.)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing
182
ORDER granting 180 Motion To Be Excused From Court Ordered Mediation. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/3/14. (O'Brien, C.)
|
November 12, 2014 |
Filing
176
ORDER granting 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Plaintiff's Breach of Oral Contract Claim; granting 162 Joint Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summar y Judgment; denying 170 Motion for Reconsideration; and denying 172 Motion to Amend 169 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Motion for Leave to Appeal - The court GRANTS defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on co unt two of plaintiff's second amended complaint. The court also GRANTS defendants' motion to file a supplement to their response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, DENIES plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, and DENIE S plaintiff's motion to amend the order on motion for partial summary judgment on count one. Finally, the court orders the parties to participate in court-hosted mediation with Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/12/2014. (Tripp, S.)
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing
169
ORDER granting 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on count one. The Severance Agreement is unenforceable. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/29/2014. (Edwards, S.)
|
April 23, 2014 |
Filing
140
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Compel and denying as moot 121 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 4/23/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
94
ORDER denying 76 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/6/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?