Woodson et al v. Allstate Insurance Company

Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gary Woodson and Rebecca Woodson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00021
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: CURRITUCK
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001 National Flood Insurance Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 56 Motion for Attorney Fees; and granting 62 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/23/2016. (Romine, L.)
July 7, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Stay and Waive Supersedeas Bond. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/7/2016. (Romine, L.)
May 4, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/3/2016. (Romine, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodson et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: John Ward O'Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Woodson
Represented By: David Roth Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Woodson
Represented By: David Roth Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?