Felton v. Gates County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Mary E. Lyons Felton
Defendant: Gates County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2015cv00020
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: GATES
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED the Board's motion to strike, (DE # 49), is DENIED. The Board's motion for summary judgment, (DE # 40), is GRANTED. Judgment is entered in favor of Gates County Board of Education and this case is closed. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 1/31/2017. Judgment to plaintiff via US Mail at via 105 Princess Anne Circle, Elizabeth City, NC 27909. (Marsh, K)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 38 Emergency Motion for Relief from Order or in the Alternative Clarification of Order Compelling Plaintiff to Sit for a Deposition and to Produce Tax Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 6/9/2016. Order mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at 105 Princess Anne Circle, Elizabeth City, NC 27909. (Marsh, K)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 5/26/2016. Order to plaintiff via US Mail at 105 Princess Anne Circle, Elizabeth City, NC 27909. (Marsh, K)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 4/19/2016. Copy of order to plaintiff via US Mail at 105 Princess Anne Circle, Elizabeth City, NC 27909. (Marsh, K)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 10/22/2015. Copy of order mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at 105 Princess Anne Circle, Elizabeth City, NC 27909. (Marsh, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felton v. Gates County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Lyons Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gates County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?