Howard v. College of the Albemarle et al
Plaintiff: Robert Howard
Defendant: College of the Albemarle and Kandi Deitemeyer
Case Number: 2:2015cv00039
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: PASQUOTANK
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 124 Motion to Reverse Judgment or, in the alternative, stay collection of the Judgment until after Plaintiffs case against College of the Albemarle is resolved by the NC Industrial Commission; granting 128 Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/12/2019. (Sellers, N.)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 118 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/30/2018. Sent to Robert Howard at 309 N Estes Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 103 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting 104 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $5741.35 against Plaintiff. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/29/2017. Sent to Robert Howard at 309 N Estes Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendants' motion for summary judgment [D.E. 38], DENIES as moot plaintiffs motion under Rule 56( d) [D.E. 46], GRANTS defendants' motions to seal [D.E. 73, 99], GRANTS p laintiffs motions to seal [D.E. 79, 87, 95], DENIES plaintiffs motion to compel and for sanctions [D.E. 83], DENIES plaintiffs motion to depose two witnesses [D.E. 84], GRANTS defendants' motion for leave to file a brief in excess often pages [D .E. 89], and DENIES defendants' motion to strike [D.E. 97]. Defendants may file a motion for costs in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's local rules. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/27/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Seal Document - Exhibit 53 to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (D.E. 39) shall be placed under seal; denying without prejudice 64 Motion to Seal; granting 65 Motion to Seal Document - Howards Memorandum of L aw in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (D.E. 58) and his Opposing Statement of Facts (D.E. 59) shall be placed under seal; denying as moot 66 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II on 11/29/2016. Sent to Robert Howard at 309 N Estes Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER referred 40 Motion to Seal Document ; referred 53 Motion for Protective Order; referred 57 Motion for Protective Order; referred 64 Motion to Seal; referred 65 Motion to Seal Document ; referred 66 Motion to Strike; granting 67 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/31/2016. Sent to Robert Howard at 309 N Estes Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Qualified PROTECTIVE ORDER governing Plaintiff's Medical Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/16/2016. Sent to Robert Howard at 309 N Estes Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Seal Document. The Motion to Seal is hereby granted as follows: the Proposed Sealed Materials listed above and as originally filed shall be and remain sealed until further ordered by the Court; Within 10 days of the ent ry of this order, Defendants shall also file with the Court, not under seal, portions of certain affidavits as follows: Wendy Brickhouse, paragraphs 2024; Kandi Deitemeyer, paragraphs 816; and John Leidy, paragraph 12. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 6/24/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/8/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. College of the Albemarle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College of the Albemarle
Represented By: John D. Leidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandi Deitemeyer
Represented By: John D. Leidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?