Sutton-Gallop v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Valerie Faye Sutton-Gallop
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv00011
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: PASQUOTANK
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Attorney Fees and 46 Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/5/2019. (Tripp, S.)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Attorney Fees. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/11/2017. (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/14/2017. (Tripp, S.)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Carolyn W Colvin answer due 6/10/2016; granting 11 Motion respond out of time. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 5/16/2016. (Edwards, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton-Gallop v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Faye Sutton-Gallop
Represented By: Branch W. Vincent, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?