Butler v. Ballard
Plaintiff: Terry Lynn Butler
Defendant: Margaret Ann Ballard
Case Number: 2:2016cv00062
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: PASQUOTANK
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that For the reasons stated within the order, defendants motion to dismiss, DE 27 , is GRANTED. Plaintiffs request for leave to amend the complaint, DE 36 , is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of defendant and close this case. Signed by Susan K. Edwards, Deputy for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/2/2017. Copy sent to Terry Lynn Butler, P. O. Box 4252, Cleveland, TN 37320 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER regarding 47 Correspondence and MOTION for clarification regarding dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/7/2017. Parties should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Order to plaintiff via US Mail at P. O. Box 4252, Cleveland, TN 37320 and via Notice of Electronic Notification at e-mail address on record. (Marsh, K)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 38 Motion to receive notices of electronic filing, granting in part 39 Motion for the court to provide free electronic copy and granting 40 Motion Continuance to allow for Butler to Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 1/6/2017. Order to plaintiff via US Mail at PO Box 4252, Cleveland, TN 37320. (Marsh, K)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 32 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/7/2016. Order to plaintiff via US Mail at P. O. Box 4252, Cleveland, TN 37320. (Marsh, K)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 9 Motion to set trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 10/7/2016. Order to plaintiff via US Mail at P. O. Box 4252, Cleveland, TN 37320. (Marsh, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lynn Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Ann Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?