Burke v. Hill, et al
Plaintiff: |
Peter Burke, Sr. |
Defendant: |
Robin Hill and Roy A. Cooper, III |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00001 |
Filed: |
February 6, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Northern Division Office |
County: |
PASQUOTANK |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 13, 2019 |
Filing
45
Order - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlemen t not be consummated within 45 days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice on or before October 28, 2019. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/13/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
August 27, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Medicaid and procedural due process claims are allowed to proceed. Defendant is DIRECTED to lodge its answer in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Initial order governing planning and scheduling will follow. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/27/2018. (Collins, S.)
|
October 31, 2017 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against defendants Cooper and McCrory are DISMISSED. The deadline for service of defendant Hill is EXTENDED to December 15, 2017. The clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a summ ons addressed for delivery to defendant Hill at 2001 Mail Service Center, Raleigh, North Carolina, 27699-2001. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to effect service of same within the December 15, 2017, deadline. The clerk also is DIRECTED to amend the docket to bring it in conformity with the caption. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/31/2017. (A certified copy of this order was sent via US mail to pro se plaintiff directed to: Peter Burke, Sr., 1606 Brookridge Drive, Elizabeth City, NC 27909) (Collins, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?