Shinaberry v. Town of Murfreesboro, N.C. et al
Plaintiff: |
Terry Lee Shinaberry |
Defendant: |
Town of Murfreesboro, N.C., Bobbie J Barmer, Michael P Hinton, Revelle & Lee, LLP, Hertford County, N.C., Guilford County, N.C., Hertford County Sheriff's Office, Humane Society of the United States and Joann Jones |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00007 |
Filed: |
March 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Northern Division Office |
County: |
HERTFORD |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Dever |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 23, 2019 |
Filing
97
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that on October 17, 2017, Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint removing Guilford County as a defendant.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, AND DECREED that on April 16, 2018 the court GRANTED the motions to dismiss [D.E. 60, 63], and DISMISSED the Town of Murfreesboro and the Humane Society of the United States as defendants, and DISMISSED plaintiff's negligent infliction of emotional distress claim and civil conspiracy claim against all defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendants' motion for summary judgment [D.E. 90]. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/23/2019. (Sellers, N.)
|
April 30, 2019 |
Filing
89
ORDER granting 77 Motion for Protective Order; granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 83 Motion to Compel. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 4/30/2019. (Sellers, N.)
|
March 29, 2019 |
Filing
78
ORDER allowing 74 Motion to Quash. The discovery period is extended to April 3, 2019 for the sole purpose of allowing Plaintiff to depose Joann Jones and Michael P. Hinton under the amended deposition notices and by agreement of the parties. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 3/29/2019. (Sellers, N.)
|
April 16, 2018 |
Filing
67
ORDER - The court GRANTS the motions to dismiss [D.E. 60, 63], and DISMISSES the Town of Murfreesboro and the Humane Society of the United States as defendants, and DISMISSES plaintiff's negligent infliction of emotional distress claim and civil conspiracy claim against all defendants. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/16/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
|
October 11, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER dismissing as moot 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing as moot 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 49 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file his first amended complaint by October 17, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/11/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?