P&MR of Hatteras, Inc. v. Kennedy, et al
Plaintiff: P&MR of Hatteras, Inc.
Defendant: Charles L. Kennedy, Jr. and M/V REEL DEAL
Case Number: 2:2017cv00013
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: DARE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Release Vessel. Upon satisfaction of the United States Marshal's fees from the Plaintiff's deposit, the vessel REEL DEAL be released from the custody forthwith of the United States Marshal, and any funds remaining on deposit with the United States Marshal be returned to the Plaintiff. Signed by United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/22/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/16/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Refer this Matter to Arbitration Stay Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/4/2017. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P&MR of Hatteras, Inc. v. Kennedy, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P&MR of Hatteras, Inc.
Represented By: Stevenson L. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Kennedy, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Kenneth Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V REEL DEAL
Represented By: Justin Kenneth Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?