Lujan v. Chowan University et al
Plaintiff: |
Marco A. Lujan |
Defendant: |
Chowan University and Lisa Bland |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00057 |
Filed: |
November 10, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Northern Division Office |
County: |
HERTFORD |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 6, 2019 |
Filing
144
Order - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlemen t not be consummated within 45 days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice on or before September 20, 2019. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/6/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
February 5, 2019 |
Filing
91
ORDER finding as moot 63 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 66 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 85 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Plaintif f is DIRECTED to file his proposed amended complaint (DE 85-1) within seven days hereof. Responsive pleadings and/or any motion shall be due in the ordinary course. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/5/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing
61
ORDER finding as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 47 Motion to File Second Am ended Complaint; finding as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file the amended complaint within seven days hereof. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/8/2018. (Collins, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?