Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. United States Fish and Wildlife Service response due 3/21/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/22/2019. (Stouch, L.)
February 22, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
February 15, 2019 Motion No Longer Referred to Peter A: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
February 13, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint up to and including March 21, 2019. (Stouch, L.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, up to and including March 21, 2019 filed by United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ramirez, Roberto) Modified on 2/13/2019 to correct event used(Hockaday, A.).
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Roberto F. Ramirez on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Ramirez, Roberto)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Certified Mail filed by Center for Biological Diversity as to United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 1/18/2019. (de Jong, Perrin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Collette L. Adkins on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity. (Adkins, Collette)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this Case is reassigned to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. District Judge James C. Dever, III is no longer assigned to case All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 2:19-CV-1-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/4/2019. (Moore, P. )
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney's Office and the Acting U.S. Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity (de Jong, Perrin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Perrin W. de Jong on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity. (de Jong, Perrin)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - The financial disclosure statement and the Notice of Appearance are both stand alone documents. Counsel needs to refile the financial disclosure statement using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement" and a separate filing using the event "Notices-Notice of Appearance". (Rudd, D.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4777355.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to civil cover sheet, #3 Financial disclosure, #4 Notice of appearance, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed summons for defendant, #6 Proposed Summons Proposed summons for U.S. Attorney, #7 Proposed Summons Proposed summons for U.S. Attorney General) (de Jong, Perrin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Roberto F. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Perrin W. de Jong
Represented By: Collette L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?