Self et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: James H. Self and Caroline J. Self
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Case Number: 2:2019cv00003
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Caroline J. Self, James H. Self. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Frost, Joseph)
February 18, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Stevenson, Colby) Modified on 2/19/2019 - changed docket text to identify correctly identify document attached and added docket entry relationship. (Sellers, N.)
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Stevenson, Colby)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Stevenson, Colby)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew W. Buckmiller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Buckmiller, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Caroline J. Self (Frost, Joseph)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by James H. Self (Frost, Joseph)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Z. Frost on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Frost, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have an additional thirty (30) days within which to serve their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint, this additional time to extend to and include February 18, 2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/18/2019. Copy sent to Plaintiff's counsel Matthew W. Buckmiller and Jospeh Z. Frost of Stubbs Perdue at 9208 Falls of Neuse Rd., Suite 201, Raleigh, NC 27615 mailed via US Mail on January 14, 2019. (Stouch, L.)
January 18, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer) (Stevenson, Colby)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Stevenson, Colby)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. BANCORP for U.S. Bank National Association. (Stevenson, Colby)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Stevenson, Colby)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Colby B. Stevenson on behalf of All Defendants. (Stevenson, Colby)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1) a supplemental removal cover sheet shall be filed with a Notice of Removal. This form can be found on the Court's website at http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/forms/Default.aspx. Counsel should use the event "Notice-(other)" located in the Notices category when filing this document. (Sellers, N.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Matthew W. Buckmiller and Jospeh Z. Frost of Stubbs Perdue at 9208 Falls of Neuse Rd., Suite 201, Raleigh, NC 27615 mailed via US Mail on January 14, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
January 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Taylor, Nathan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association from Pasquotank County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-815. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4787323), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings - part 2) (Taylor, Nathan) Modified on 1/14/2019 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Nathan J. Taylor
Represented By: Colby B. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Nathan J. Taylor
Represented By: Colby B. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Nathan J. Taylor
Represented By: Colby B. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Self
Represented By: Matthew W. Buckmiller
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline J. Self
Represented By: Matthew W. Buckmiller
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?