Jones v. Stanislawski et al
Plaintiff: Tena Alexander Jones
Defendant: Justin Paul Stanislawski and Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00004
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2019. Motions due by 9/15/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 2/22/2019. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
February 20, 2019 Remark - Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Jones for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Tena Alexander Jones. (Thompson, C.)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/24/2019. (Stouch, L.)
January 24, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #7 Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Stouch, L.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Wanzek Construction, Inc. and Justin Paul Stanislawski (Yntema, Brady) Modified on 1/24/2019 to add names of both defendants who filed. (Stouch, L.).
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tena Alexander Jones (Thompson, C.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by C. Everett Thompson, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, C.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by C. Everett Thompson, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, C.)
January 22, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Yntema, Brady)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc. regarding Notice of Deficiency, #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Yntema, Brady)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Brady Allen Yntema on behalf of All Defendants. (Yntema, Brady)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel C. Everett Thompson, II and David R. Pureza of THOMPSON & PUREZA, P.A. at 101 West Main Street, Elizabeth City, NC 27909 mailed via US Mail on January 18, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event "Notice-Other". Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Justin Paul Stanislawski, Wanzek Construction, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wanzek Construction, Inc., Justin Paul Stanislawski from Perquimans County State Court, case number 18 CVS 210. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4795696), filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc., Justin Paul Stanislawski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complete Perquimans County Court file, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Yntema, Brady)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Stanislawski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Paul Stanislawski
Represented By: Brady Allen Yntema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Brady Allen Yntema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tena Alexander Jones
Represented By: C. Everett Thompson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?