North Carolina Wildlife Federation et al v. North Carolina Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: North Carolina Wildlife Federation and No Mid-Currituck Bridge-Concerned Citizens and Visitors Opposed to the Mid-Currituck Bridge
Defendant: James H. Trogdon, III, Edward T. Parker, North Carolina Department of Transportation and Federal Highway Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00014
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:1201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting the Motion for Extension of Time #10 filed by Defendants James H. Trogdon, III and the North Carolina Department of Transportation. For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiffs, it is ordered that these defendants shall have up to and including June 28 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/10/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
May 10, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,,, filed by North Carolina Department of Transportation, James H. Trogdon, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Hunt, Kacy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by James H. Trogdon, III (Hunt, Kacy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina Department of Transportation (Hunt, Kacy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Kacy Lynn Hunt on behalf of North Carolina Department of Transportation, James H. Trogdon, III. (Hunt, Kacy)
April 30, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by No Mid-Currituck Bridge-Concerned Citizens and Visitors Opposed to the Mid-Currituck Bridge (Hunter, Kimberley)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina Wildlife Federation (Hunter, Kimberley)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Highway Administration, North Carolina Department of Transportation, Edward T. Parker, James H. Trogdon, III. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.) (Collins, S.)
April 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The Financial Disclosure Statements attached as Exhibits 8 and 9 are to be filed as stand alone events. Counsel is directed to refile these documents. (Collins, S.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Ramona H. McGee on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McGee, Ramona)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kimberley Hunter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hunter, Kimberley)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Highway Administration, North Carolina Department of Transportation, Edward T. Parker, James H. Trogdon, III ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4917992.), filed by North Carolina Wildlife Federation, No Mid-Currituck Bridge-Concerned Citizens and Visitors Opposed to the Mid-Currituck Bridge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons for Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina, #4 Proposed Summons Summons for FHWA, #5 Proposed Summons Summons for NCDOT, #6 Proposed Summons Summons for Edward Parker, #7 Proposed Summons Summons for James Trogdon, III, #8 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement for NCWF, #9 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement for NoMCB) (Hunter, Kimberley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Carolina Wildlife Federation et al v. North Carolina Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Trogdon, III
Represented By: Kacy Lynn Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward T. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Transportation
Represented By: Kacy Lynn Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Ramona H. McGee
Represented By: Kimberley Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Mid-Currituck Bridge-Concerned Citizens and Visitors Opposed to the Mid-Currituck Bridge
Represented By: Ramona H. McGee
Represented By: Kimberley Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?