United States of America v. Seufer et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Michael Seufer and Carrie Seufer
Case Number: 2:2019cv00021
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. All Defendants' answer due 9/3/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/1/2019. Copy sent to defendants via US Mail to 260 S. Indiantown Rd., Shawboro NC 27973. (Stouch, L.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Carrie and Michael Seufer regarding Notices of Self Representation, Financial Disclosure Statements, and Service sent via US Mail to 260 S. Indiantown Rd., Shawboro NC 27973. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order Notice) (Stouch, L.)
August 1, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Carrie Seufer served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Choksi, Kunal)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Carrie Seufer, Michael Seufer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Michael Seufer served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Choksi, Kunal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Carrie Seufer served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Choksi, Kunal)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Seufer. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kunal J. Choksi on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Choksi, Kunal)
June 26, 2019 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED IN WRONG CASE*** Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.) Modified on 6/26/2019 (Stouch, L.).
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carrie Seufer, Michael Seufer. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
June 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding Proposed Summonses. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Stouch, L.)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Stouch, L.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrie Seufer, Michael Seufer, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Carrie Seufer, #4 Proposed Summons Michael Seufer) (Choksi, Kunal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Seufer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Seufer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Seufer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kunal J. Choksi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?