Sosa v. Autozone Stores LLC
Plaintiff: David Sosa
Defendant: Autozone Stores LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00018
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by David Sosa. (Stouch, L.)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief filed by David Sosa. (Stouch, L.)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Autozone Stores LLC identifying Corporate Parent AutoZone, Inc. for Autozone Stores LLC. (Oliver, George)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Autozone Stores LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Stouch, L.)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 12 Letter Issued to David Sosa as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief. Responses due by 5/20/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to David Sosa PO Box 1695, Kill Devil Hills, NC 27948. (Stouch, L.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief filed by Autozone Stores LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Wood) (Oliver, George)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by George J. Oliver on behalf of Autozone Stores LLC. (Oliver, George)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 USPS Return Receipt addressed to Autozone Stores. (Stouch, L.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Autozone Stores LLC. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by David Sosa. (Rudd, D.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by David Sosa. (Rudd, D.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Autozone Stores LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GRN002436), filed by David Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa v. Autozone Stores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Stores LLC
Represented By: George J. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?