Bailey et al v. County of Dare, North Carolina
Plaintiff: Todd A Edgar, Sheryl S Michael, E. Thompson Brown, John P. Bailey, Babette S Edgar and Paul W Michael, Jr.
Defendant: County of Dare, North Carolina
Case Number: 2:2020cv00020
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint. County of Dare, North Carolina answer to Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 6/27/2020. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/26/2020. (Collins, S.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by County of Dare, North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Castro, Brian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 Selection of Judge Robert N. Hunter, Jr. as mediator filed by John P. Bailey, E. Thompson Brown, Babette S Edgar, Todd A Edgar, Sheryl S Michael, Paul W Michael, Jr.. (Kitchen, S.)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint. County of Dare, North Carolina answer due 5/27/2020. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/29/2020. (Collins, S.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint,, filed by County of Dare, North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Castro, Brian)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian F. Castro on behalf of County of Dare, North Carolina. (Castro, Brian)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Geis on behalf of County of Dare, North Carolina. (Geis, Christopher)
April 21, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John P. Bailey, E. Thompson Brown, Babette S Edgar, Todd A Edgar, Sheryl S Michael, Paul W Michael, Jr.. (Kitchen, S.)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John P. Bailey, E. Thompson Brown, Babette S Edgar, Todd A Edgar, Sheryl S Michael, Paul W Michael, Jr.. (Kitchen, S.)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint filed by John P. Bailey, E. Thompson Brown, Babette S Edgar, Todd A Edgar, Sheryl S Michael, Paul W Michael, Jr. served on County of Dare, c/o Robert L. Outten, County Manager on April 15, 2020. (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to County of Dare, North Carolina. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Babette S Edgar (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Todd A Edgar (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by E. Thompson Brown (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sheryl S Michael (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Paul W Michael, Jr. (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by John P. Bailey (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by S. C. Kitchen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kitchen, S.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5382706.), filed by Babette S Edgar, E. Thompson Brown, John P. Bailey, Sheryl S Michael, Paul W Michael, Jr., Todd A Edgar. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Resolution Amending Chapter 92 Emergency Management, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Declaration Imposing Restrictions and Prohibitions, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Web Page showing restrictions on travel, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Declaration Amending Restrictions and Prohibitions) (Kitchen, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. County of Dare, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd A Edgar
Represented By: S. C. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl S Michael
Represented By: S. C. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Thompson Brown
Represented By: S. C. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Bailey
Represented By: S. C. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babette S Edgar
Represented By: S. C. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul W Michael, Jr.
Represented By: S. C. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Dare, North Carolina
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?