Sawyer v. Saul
Defendant: Elizabeth D Sawyer, Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00033
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Affidavit of Service US Atty for Eastern District of NC filed by Elizabeth D Sawyer served on US Atty for Eastern District of NC on 07/01/2020. (Vincent, Branch)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Affidavit of Service General Counsel filed by Elizabeth D Sawyer served on General Counsel on 06/29/2020. (Vincent, Branch)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Affidavit of Service Attorney General of the U.S. filed by Elizabeth D Sawyer served on Attorney General on 06/29/2020. (Vincent, Branch)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, Attorney General and US Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Elizabeth D Sawyer (Vincent, Branch)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Branch W. Vincent, III on behalf of Elizabeth D Sawyer. (Vincent, Branch)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5456524.), filed by Elizabeth D Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons US Atty General, #3 Proposed Summons General Counsel, #4 Proposed Summons US Atty, EDNC) (Vincent, Branch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth D Sawyer
Represented By: Branch W. Vincent, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?