Baum v. PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher C. Baum
Defendant: The Freight Barge Vessel PCS 2 and PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00035
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1292
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/29/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 29, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #11 Answer to Amended Complaint. All counsel appearing on behalf of a party should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Waddell, K.)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.. (Chignell, Kevin)
July 6, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including July 29, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #5 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/6/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
July 6, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
July 3, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nutrien Ltd. for PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.. (Chignell, Kevin)
July 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., The Freight Barge Vessel PCS 2. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time) (Chignell, Kevin)
July 3, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Lee Chignell on behalf of PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., The Freight Barge Vessel PCS 2. (Chignell, Kevin)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher C. Baum. PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Summons Issued as to PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. *Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Waddell, K.)
June 11, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., The Freight Barge Vessel PCS 2, filed by Christopher C. Baum. (Newton, J.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Jefferson Newton on behalf of Christopher C. Baum. (Newton, J.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Christopher C. Baum (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Stevenson L. Weeks on behalf of Christopher C. Baum. (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., The Freight Barge Vessel PCS 2, filed by Christopher C. Baum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Weeks, Stevenson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baum v. PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Freight Barge Vessel PCS 2
Represented By: Kevin Lee Chignell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Chignell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher C. Baum
Represented By: J. Jefferson Newton
Represented By: Stevenson L. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?