Sanderlin v. Kim et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Tyler Sanderlin
Defendant: Daniel Eugene Kin, Virasack Mack Phienboupha, Indie Srishord, Patrick Xiao, Xinpeng Tang, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company and Daniel Eugene Kim
Case Number: 2:2020cv00063
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons-Daniel Kin, #3 Exhibit C-Summons-Patrick Xiao, #4 Exhibit D- Summons-Indie Srishold, #5 Exhibit E-Summons-Xinpeng Tang, #6 Exhibit F-Summons-Virasack Phienbroupha, #7 Exhibit G-Verified Complaint) (Smith, Allen) Modified on 11/2/2020 - changed docket text to correspond with document filed. Wrong event used. (Sellers, N.)
October 30, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Branch W. Vincent, III on behalf of Jordan Tyler Sanderlin. (Vincent, Branch)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding #16 Order on Motion to Withdraw. Not later than October 30, 2020, plaintiff SHALL inform the court whether he wishes to proceed pro se or have Mr. Vincent file a notice of appearance. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 10/16/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 10/15/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Jeffrey A. Breit of Breit Cantor Grana & Beasley at 22nd Street, Suite 402, Virginia Beach, VA 23451 (Stouch, L.)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION to Remand by Jordan Tyler Sanderlin. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - 9-30-20 Order entering judgment for Sanderlin (Dare County), #3 Exhibit 2 - Sizelove-Farmer v. Johnson, #4 Exhibit 3 - Hickman v. Hinson, #5 Exhibit 4 - Beeson v. South Carolina, #6 Exhibit 5 - Constantin v. Fogle, #7 Exhibit 6 - Dean v. Roberts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Vaughan v. Dixon) (Beasley, Allen)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Jordan Tyler Sanderlin. (Beasley, Allen)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jordan Tyler Sanderlin (Beasley, Allen)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Allen W. Beasley on behalf of Jordan Tyler Sanderlin. (Beasley, Allen)
October 13, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever, III regarding #11 MOTION to Withdraw. (Stouch, L.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Jeffrey A. Breit on behalf of Jordan Tyler Sanderlin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stouch, L.)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Manually. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Jeffrey A. Breit of Breit Cantor Grana & Beasley at 22nd Street, Suite 402, Virginia Beach, VA 23451. (Stouch, L.)
October 2, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to File Manually. (Stouch, L.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Manually filed by Jordan Tyler Sanderlin. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Withdraw, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Smith, Allen)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Smith, Allen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Smith, Allen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Smith, Allen)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Jeffrey A. Breit of Breit Cantor Grana & Beasley at 22nd Street, Suite 402, Virginia Beach, VA 23451; and Defendants Virasack M. Phienboupha at 1206 Hale Ct., Woodbridge, VA 22191; Patrick Xiao at 4018 Pickstone Dr., Fairfax, VA 22032; Danie E. Kim at 8637 Aberdeen Court, Annandale, VA 22003 and Xinpeng Tang at 416 Stabler Lane, Alexandria, VA 22304 mailed via US Mail on September 16, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
September 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
September 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Allen Coleman Smith on behalf of Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Smith, Allen)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Smith, Allen)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company from Dare County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-202. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5618683), filed by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit C-Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Summons, #5 Exhibit E-Summons, #6 Exhibit F-Summons, #7 Exhibit G-NC Dept.of Insurance, #8 Exhibit H-Letter) (Smith, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderlin v. Kim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Tyler Sanderlin
Represented By: Branch W. Vincent, III
Represented By: Allen W. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Eugene Kin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virasack Mack Phienboupha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indie Srishord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Xiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xinpeng Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company
Represented By: Allen Coleman Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Eugene Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?