Felix v. Doughtie et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Felix
Defendant: Doug Doughtie, Rob Ross, Dare County, North Carolina, Andrew Womble, Jeff Cruden, Donavan Ruth, Roy Cooper, Jennifer Bland, Jim Tobin, Governor McCrory, Robert Outten, Danny Couch, Steve House, Robert Woodard, Ervin Bateman, Josh Stein and Wally Overman
Case Number: 2:2021cv00007
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 35 Motion for Court Ordered Discovery Prior to Court Judgment on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss filed by Daniel Felix. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
April 6, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Ervin Bateman, Danny Couch, Dare County, North Carolina, Doug Doughtie, Steve House, Robert Outten, Wally Overman, Rob Ross, Donavan Ruth, Jim Tobin, Robert Woodard. (Castro, Brian)
April 5, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Felix. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 32 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Daniel Felix as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Response due by 4/23/2021. (Collins, S.)
March 30, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Ervin Bateman, Danny Couch, Dare County, North Carolina, Doug Doughtie, Steve House, Robert Outten, Wally Overman, Rob Ross, Donavan Ruth, Jim Tobin, Robert Woodard. (Castro, Brian) Modified on 4/1/2021 to create docket entry relationship to memorandum #19 and reply #29 . (Collins, S.).
March 29, 2021 Filing 30 Motion to Amend Complaint Facts and Claims #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Felix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Photos, #2 Exhibit - Emails and Articles, #3 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
March 26, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ervin Bateman, Danny Couch, Dare County, North Carolina, Doug Doughtie, Steve House, Robert Outten, Wally Overman, Rob Ross, Donavan Ruth, Jim Tobin, Robert Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Judgment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Unpublished Opinion, #5 Exhibit 5 - Judgment Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order) (Castro, Brian)
March 25, 2021 Filing 28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Felix. (Collins, S.)
March 25, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniel Felix. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Unpublished Opinion of Fourth Circuit 20-1471, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Roy Cooper, Governor McCrory and Josh Stein answer due 4/18/2021. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/23/2021. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Daniel Felix, P. O. Box 544, Frisco, NC 27936-0544.) (Collins, S.)
March 22, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
March 18, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Roy Cooper, Governor McCrory, Josh Stein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Nichols, Bryan)
March 18, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan G. Nichols on behalf of Roy Cooper, Governor McCrory, Josh Stein. (Nichols, Bryan)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Jennifer Bland, Jeff Cruden and Andrew Womble answer due 4/16/2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/18/2021. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Daniel Felix, P. O. Box 544, Frisco, NC 27936-0544.) (Collins, S.)
March 18, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Jennifer Bland, Jeff Cruden, Andrew Womble. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shields, Kathryn)
March 16, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn H. Shields on behalf of Jennifer Bland, Jeff Cruden, Andrew Womble. (Shields, Kathryn)
March 15, 2021 Filing 20 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Daniel Felix as to #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 4/8/2021. (Collins, S.)
March 15, 2021 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support regarding #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ervin Bateman, Danny Couch, Dare County, North Carolina, Doug Doughtie, Steve House, Robert Outten, Wally Overman, Rob Ross, Donavan Ruth, Jim Tobin, Robert Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Felix I, DE 42 - Defs' Brief ISO Motion to Dismiss 1st Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dare County Feral Cat Ordinance, Passed 1-19-2016) (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ervin Bateman, Danny Couch, Dare County, North Carolina, Doug Doughtie, Steve House, Robert Outten, Wally Overman, Rob Ross, Donavan Ruth, Jim Tobin, Robert Woodard. (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Outten (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wally Overman (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Steve House (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rob Ross (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jim Tobin (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ervin Bateman (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Danny Couch (Castro, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Woodard. (Castro, Brian) Modified on 3/15/2021 to revise docket text to reflect correct filer. (Collins, S.).
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian F. Castro on behalf of Ervin Bateman, Danny Couch, Dare County, North Carolina, Doug Doughtie, Steve House, Robert Outten, Wally Overman, Rob Ross, Donavan Ruth, Jim Tobin, Robert Woodard. (Castro, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 Proof of Mailing of Service Documents filed by Daniel Felix. (Attachments: #1 Copies of Certified Mail Receipts and signed Green Cards, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk, to Daniel Felix returning issued summons for service under Rule 4. (Collins, S.)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (*NOTICE: Plaintiff shall serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) Copy sent via US Mail to Daniel Felix at P. O. Box 544, Frisco, NC 27936-0544. (Stouch, L.)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this Case is reassigned to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 2:21-CV-7-FL.Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/17/2021. (Moore, P. ) Modified on 2/18/2021 to indicate that a copy of this Text Order was sent via US mail to Daniel Felix, P. O. Box 544, Frisco, NC 27936-0544 (Collins, S.).
February 16, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 2.00, receipt number RAL083293. Total filing fee paid: $402.00. (Stouch, L.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Daniel Felix. (Rudd, D.)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Daniel Felix. (Rudd, D.)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL083167.) See [DE 1-4], filed by Daniel Felix. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Cover letter from plaintiff, #4 Letter to Pro Se Plaintiff regarding shortage of filing fee, #5 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix v. Doughtie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Doughtie
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Ross
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dare County, North Carolina
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Womble
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cruden
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donavan Ruth
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cooper
Represented By: Bryan G. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Bland
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Tobin
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor McCrory
Represented By: Bryan G. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Outten
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Couch
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve House
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Woodard
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin Bateman
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Stein
Represented By: Bryan G. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wally Overman
Represented By: Brian F. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?