Vaughan v. Romm et al
Plaintiff: Susan W. Vaughan
Defendant: Kathlyn S. Romm, Ray Matusko, Courtney Hull and Meader W. Harriss, III
Case Number: 2:2021cv00042
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Certificate of Service filed by Susan W. Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Geis on behalf of Courtney Hull, Kathlyn S. Romm. (Geis, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susan W. Vaughan. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/28/2021. Sent to Susan W. Vaughan at 1417 19th Street Greensboro, NC 27405 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
September 28, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Susan W. Vaughan. (Rudd, D.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Susan W. Vaughan. (Rudd, D.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Susan W. Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Correspondence and Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #7 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #8 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. Romm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan W. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathlyn S. Romm
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Matusko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Hull
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meader W. Harriss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?