Gilbert v. Deutche Bank Trust Company Americas as trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rex T Gilbert
Defendant: Deutche Bank Trust Company Americas as trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Funding, LLC, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Daniela L Gilbert and David A. Simpson, PC, Substitute Trustee
Case Number: 4:2009cv00181
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: HYDE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER - Deutsche Bank's motion to dismiss [D.E. 77] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court DISMISSES count four for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The court declines to dismiss any portion of count two. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/16/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER dismissing 45 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by US District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/4/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration: The Gilberts' motion does not meet the standard for relief under Rule 59( e). Accordingly, plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration [D.E. 34] is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 10/19/2010. (Sawyer, D.)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT in favor of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Residential Funding, LLC, David A. Simpson, P.C. against Daniela L Gilbert, Rex T. Gilbert, Jr. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk on 7/8/2010. (Sawyer, D.)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 7/7/2010. Copies served. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Deutche Bank Trust Company Americas as trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutche Bank Trust Company Americas as trustee for Residential Accredit Loans, Inc.
Represented By: James R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding, LLC
Represented By: James R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: James R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniela L Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Simpson, PC, Substitute Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex T Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?