Crop Production Services, Inc. v. Ormond et al
Plaintiff: |
Crop Production Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Thomas Ormond, Sr., Ormond Farms, Gloria W. Ormond, Thomas B. Ormond, Jr. and Shelia B. Ormond |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv00041 |
Filed: |
March 18, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Eastern Division Office |
County: |
BEAUFORT |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Dever |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
12 U.S.C. ยง 1730 Collection Under Contract Guaranty |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 6, 2013 |
Filing
62
ORDER STAYING CASE: This action is STAYED pending resolution ofthe bankruptcy case. Parties shall notify the court within 14 days of settlement or resolution of the bankruptcy case. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/6/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 1/18/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Crop Production Services, Inc. v. Ormond et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Thomas Ormond, Sr. |
Represented By: |
Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ormond Farms |
Represented By: |
Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Gloria W. Ormond |
Represented By: |
Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Thomas B. Ormond, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Shelia B. Ormond |
Represented By: |
Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Crop Production Services, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Luther Donald Starling, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?