Sirsi Corporation v. Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System Featured Case
Plaintiff: Sirsi Corporation
Defendant: Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System
Case Number: 4:2011cv00059
Filed: April 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CRAVEN
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Filing 36 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Discovery and mediation will be concluded by 7/16/12 and dispositive motions shall be filed by 8/15/12. Counsel should review the Order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel on 5/7/12. (Talbert, S.)
May 4, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel: 35 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 34 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. (Talbert, S.)
May 3, 2012 Filing 35 Consent MOTION to Amend 34 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Numbers, Robert)
March 9, 2012 Filing 34 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Discovery and Mediation will be concluded by 5/16/12. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/15/12. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel on 3/9/12. (Talbert, S.)
March 9, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel: 33 Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. (Talbert, S.)
March 8, 2012 Filing 33 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Numbers, Robert)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - Mediation will be concluded by 3/16/12. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel on 1/19/12. (Talbert, S.)
January 12, 2012 Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/10/12. (Talbert, S.)
January 11, 2012 Filing 30 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Discovery will be concluded by 3/16/12 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 4/16/12. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel on 1/1012. (Talbert, S.)
January 10, 2012 Filing 29 Proposed Order re 26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System, Sirsi Corporation. (Numbers, Robert)
January 10, 2012 Motion Submitted to U.S. District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: 26 MOTION for Protective Order . (Talbert, S.)
January 10, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel: 27 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 19 Scheduling Order . (Talbert, S.)
January 3, 2012 Filing 28 Proposed Order re 26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreement to Be Bound by Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement) (Numbers, Robert)
December 23, 2011 Filing 27 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 19 Scheduling Order by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order allowing modification of Scheduling Order) (Numbers, Robert)
December 23, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION for Protective Order by Sirsi Corporation. (Numbers, Robert)
October 24, 2011 Filing 25 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Sirsi Corporation. re 23 MOTION to Compel Responses to its First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Sirsi Corporation. (Numbers, Robert)
October 18, 2011 REMINDER TO COUNSEL as to Sirsi Corporation Pursuant to Judge Boyle's Practice and Procedures located on the court's website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/html/chambersTWB.htm, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. If your recently filed document(s) is less than 20 pages or if you have already mailed the courtesy copy(ies), disregard this notice. (Tripp, S.)
October 17, 2011 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Compel Responses to its First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Email & SirsiDynix's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, # 2 Exhibit B- Letter dated October 13, 2011, # 3 Exhibit C- Thompson v. NAVISTAR) (Numbers, Robert)
October 17, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Responses to its First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Sirsi Corporation. (Numbers, Robert)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/29/11. (Talbert, S.)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Appointing Mediator Richard T. Boyette. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 9/29/2011. (Beasley, B.)
September 27, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System, Sirsi Corporation re Docket Annotation, Notice of Selection of Mediator (Numbers, Robert)
September 9, 2011 Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before September 30, 2011. (Beasley, B.)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2012. Motions due by 3/1/2012.Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel on 9/6/11. (Tripp, S.)
September 6, 2011 Motion Submitted to U.S. District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6). (Talbert, S.)
September 1, 2011 Remark - Parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel. (Talbert, S.)
August 31, 2011 Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) by Sirsi Corporation. (Numbers, Robert)
August 1, 2011 REMINDER TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Judge Boyle's Practice and Procedures located on the court's website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/html/chambersTWB.htm, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. If your recently filed document is less than 20 pages or if you have already mailed the courtesy copy, disregard this notice. (Talbert, S.)
July 26, 2011 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6)First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supporting Cases) (Bettis, Lee) Modified on 7/27/2011 to correct docket event. (Jenkins, C.)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. The Rule 26(f) meeting must occur by 8/26/2011. Counsel should read Order for Discovery Plan in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 7/26/11. (Tripp, S.)
July 22, 2011 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6)First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) filed by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Master Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Unpublished Cases) (Numbers, Robert)
July 22, 2011 Filing 14 Plaintiff SirsiDynix's ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Sirsi Corporation. (Numbers, Robert)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6), 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Replies due by 7/22/2011. Signed by Julie Richards for Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 7/7/2011. (Ruffin, L.)
July 7, 2011 MOTION REFERRED: 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6)First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6), 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6)First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6), 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Motion referred to Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court. (Ruffin, L.)
July 6, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6)First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6), 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Numbers, Robert)
July 6, 2011 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 9 Memorandum in Support, 10 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. (Bettis, Lee) Modified on 7/7/2011 to correct docket event. (Jenkins, C.)
July 6, 2011 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 9 Memorandum in Support, 10 Memorandum in Support. In reference to docket entry #10, counsel is directed to file a Certificate of Service pursuant to Section F(3) of the CM/ECF Policy Manual. In the future, when filing a Memorandum in Support, the Memorandum should be linked to the underlying Motion. In reference to docket entry #9, counsel should refer to Section L (2)(b) of the Policy Manual regarding exhibit naming conventions. Counsel is not directed to refile docket entry #9. (Jenkins, C.)
July 5, 2011 REMINDER TO COUNSEL as to Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System - Pursuant to Judge Boyle's Practice and Procedures located on the court's website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/html/chambersTWB.htm, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. If your recently filed document is less than 20 pages or if you have already mailed the courtesy copy, disregard this notice. (Talbert, S.)
July 5, 2011 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss; with Signature Page filed by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. (Bettis, Lee)
July 5, 2011 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibt A to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Bettis, Lee)
June 20, 2011 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 7 Motion to Dismiss - All Motions should be accompanied with a Memorandum in Support. (Talbert, S.)
June 17, 2011 Filing 8 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. (Bettis, Lee)
June 17, 2011 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. Responses due by 7/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Master Software License & Services Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B- Sirsi Dynix Quote, # 3 Exhibit C- SAAS Schedule) (Bettis, Lee) Modified on 6/20/2011 to correct exhibit naming conventions. (Jenkins, C.)
June 17, 2011 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Combined document error. Motions to Dismiss and Answers can not be combined into one document. Counsel is instructed to separate the Answer and Motion to Dismiss, and re-file each pleading individually. (Jenkins, C.)
June 16, 2011 Filing 6 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Counterclaims, First COUNTERCLAIM Unfair and Deceptive Trade Practices against All Plaintiffs by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Answer and Counerclaim, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Answer and Counterclaim, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Answer and Counterclaim) (Bettis, Lee)
June 6, 2011 Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - At the direction of the Court and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above captioned case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, U.S. District Judge to conduct all proceedings in this matter. All future pleadings should reflect the revised case number 4:11-CV-59-BO. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 06/06/2011. (Baker, C.)
May 11, 2011 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System waiver sent on 4/25/2011, answer due 6/24/2011. (Numbers, Robert)
April 21, 2011 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/applications/mediators.asp. Please serve this list on all parties. (Beasley, B.)
April 18, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System. Counsel should print Summons to effect service. (Tripp, S.)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sirsi Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dewey Holding Company. (Numbers, Robert)
April 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0417-1576487.), filed by Sirsi Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons in a Civil Action) (Numbers, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sirsi Corporation v. Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sirsi Corporation
Represented By: Robert T. Numbers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craven-Pamlico-Carteret Regional Library System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?