UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $307,970.00 in U. S. Currency

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $307,970.00 in U. S. Currency
Claimant: Sirila Pineda Garcia, Lucia Yasmin Covarrubias and Apolinar Garcia-Ancelmo
Case Number: 4:2012cv00136
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PITT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 142 Second Motion to Stay Proceedings - This case is stayed for 120 additional days, up to and including October 29, 2016. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/28/2016. (Baker, C.)
January 14, 2016 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Motion to Stay Proceedings and denying 130 Motion to Dismiss - The court stays this case up to and including July 1, 2016. At the conclusion of that time, the parties will confer and provide the court with a joint status rep ort for moving forward with the case by July 10, 2016. Should the government seek continued stay of this case, any motion to that effect shall be filed no later than May 20, 2016. Claimants will be afforded the opportunity to respond, but no replies shall be allowed. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/14/2016. (Baker, C.)
July 14, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion to Unseal Document and terminating as moot 111 Motion to Seal Document - It is hereby ORDERED that the Ex Parte Law Enforcement Declaration of Agent Lance Anthony (DE# 64) be UNSEALED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/14/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 7, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Ex Parte granting 100 Ex Parte Motion to Seal 99 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE Document - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/15/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 2, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 93 Motion to Stay and denying as moot 96 Motion to Stay - All discovery is stayed pending partial resolution of claimants' motion for summary judgment by the court. The government will file a response to claimants� 39; motion for summary judgment, inasmuch as it rests on any pre-suit probable cause requirement required by 19 U.S.C. § 1615 within 10 days. After the partial resolution of claimants motion for summary judgment, discovery will resume for an add itional 60 days, with a response by the government to the outstanding portion of claimants' motion for summary judgment due within 30 days of the close of discovery. Any discovery to occur after the partial resolution of claimants' motion for summary judgment is subject to stay, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 981. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/02/2015. (Baker, C.)
November 7, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Joint Motion for Modified Case Management Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/07/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 23, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Stay of Civil Forfeiture Proceedings - The case is hereby STAYED up to and including July 23, 2014. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/23/2014. (Tripp, S.)
August 13, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel and granting 34 Motion to Stay Response to Claimants' Motion to Dismiss - The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the government's motion to compel, granting t he motion except to that part which requests this court to compel answers to special interrogatories 13, 15 and that portion of special interrogatory 9 dealing with the Mazda Tribute. Claimants shall respond to the government's interrogatories as directed herein within ten (10) days of entry of this order. The court also GRANTS the government's motion to stay its obligation to respond to claimants' motion to dismiss until twenty-one (21) days after claimants have served responses according to this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/13/2013. (Tripp, S.)
July 17, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Permit Reply in Support of Motion to Compel - Counsel for the United States is directed to file the Reply in Support of Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/17/2013. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of The Government's Motion To Amend Complaint and denying 23 Motion to Amend Complaint - The government's motion to amend is DENIE D. Claimants' motion to stay discovery is DENIED in part where it relates to the government's special interrogatories, and claimants are DIRECTED to respond to the government's special interrogatories within ten (10) days of entry of this order. Claimants' motion to stay is GRANTED in part where it requests a stay of all other discovery. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/21/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $307,970.00 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $307,970.00 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sirila Pineda Garcia
Represented By: Mark A. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lucia Yasmin Covarrubias
Represented By: Mark A. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Apolinar Garcia-Ancelmo
Represented By: Mark A. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?