Fox v. Colvin

Plaintiff: James C. Fox, Jr.
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2013cv00053
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CARTERET
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's counsel be awarded fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) in the amount of $12,000.00, and refund to Plaintiff the smaller award between this amount and the EAJA award. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 7/20/2015. (O'Brien, C.)
March 6, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 3/6/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
February 25, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court adopts the Memorandum and Recommendations [D.E. 29]. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [D.E. 21] is GRANTED, Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [D.E. 24] is DENIED, and the action is REMANDED to the Commissioner under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 2/25/2014. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Fox, Jr.
Represented By: Janet M. Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Elisa Donohoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?