Hetzel v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, et al
Plaintiff: |
Paul B. Hetzel |
Defendant: |
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Title Resource Group, Trustee Services of Carolina, LLC and US Bank National Association |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00236 |
Filed: |
November 11, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Eastern Division Office |
County: |
CARTERET |
Presiding Judge: |
Terrence W. Boyle |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 14, 2017 |
Filing
137
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 113 Motion to Strike; denying 109 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 107 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/11/2017. (Stouch, L.)
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing
81
ORDER GRANTING 64 TRG Settlement Services' Motion to Dismiss, and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 66 Chase Bank's Motino to Dismiss. TRG is now dismissed from this action. The plaintiff's negligence per se claim is dismissed against Chase. The remaining claims may proceed in their entirety. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/17/2014. (Fisher, M.)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
80
ORDER DENYING 68 Motion to Strike the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/27/2014. (Fisher, M.)
|
July 22, 2014 |
Filing
58
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 21 Defendant Chase's and US Bank's Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 29 Defendant Trustee Service's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 33 Defendant TRG's Motion to Dismiss; and GRANTING IN PART A ND DENYING IN PART 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. The claim for declaratory judgment is dismissed and US Bank and Trustee Services are dismissed as parties to this action. The proposed amendments to the complaint are allowed, except as to th e parts pertaining to US Bank, Trustee Services, the declaratory judgment claim, and the claim to enjoin foreclosure which are denied as futile. The remaining claims against Chase and TRG are allowed to proceed without prejudice to their filing new motions to dismiss that are properly tailored to the Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ordered to file a Second Amended Complaint consistent with this order by 8/2/2014. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/21/2014. (Fisher, M.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?